FULTON et al v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al Featured Case

In March 2018, the Philadelphia Department of Human Services suspended foster care referrals to Catholic Social Services (CSS) because CSS was refusing to place children with LGBTQ families and was allegedly requiring prospective families to provide a “pastoral reference.” CSS and three foster parents who share CSS's religious beliefs filed a lawsuit against the city, alleging that the decision to suspend referrals to CSS violated the agency's (and the parents') First Amendment rights.

Plaintiff: SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH and CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA and PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS
Movant: SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES and PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE
Case Number: 2:2018cv02075
Filed: May 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B. TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT PROPOSED INTERVENORS' MOTION TO INTERVENE IS GRANTED & THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL LIST SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES AND PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE AS DEFTS IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 8/13/18.8/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER THAT PROPOSED INTERVENORS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S ORDER STAYING THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, THAT THE COURT AMEND ITS ORDER TO INCLUDE AN INDICATIVE RULING PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 62.1 IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 8/1/18.8/2/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL WU-KUNG PFAUTZ on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS with Certificate of Service(PFAUTZ, MICHAEL)
July 30, 2018 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION for Reconsideration re 59 Order or, Alternatively, for Indicative Ruling pursuant to FRCP 62.1 filed by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH. (WINDHAM, LORI)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER THAT TO THE EXENT THAT PARTIES WISH TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, (DOC. 60), PARTIES SHALL RESPOND ON OR BEFORE 7/30/2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT NO REPLY BRIEFS IN CONNECTION WITH THIS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION SHALL BE FILED WITHOUT LEAVE OF COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/26/18. 7/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER THAT DEFTS' DEADLINE FOR FILING AN ANSWER OR RESPONSE TO PLFFS' COMPLAINT (DOC. 1) IS CONTINUED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/26/18. 7/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 25, 2018 Filing 62 Letter to Judge Tucker dated July 25, 2018 filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS.(FIELD, BENJAMIN) Modified on 7/25/2018 (tjd).
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER THAT PLFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL (ECF NO. 56), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/24/18.7/25/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 61 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re 56 Emergency MOTION to Enjoin Defendants, pending appeal with Proposed Order and Certification of Service filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(FIELD, BENJAMIN) Modified on 7/26/2018 (tjd).
July 20, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION for Reconsideration re 59 Order or, Alternatively, for Indicative Ruling pursuant to FRCP 62.1 filed by PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE, SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES.certificate of service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(ROPER, MARY)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF THE SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES AND PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE TO INTERVENE AS DEFENDANTS IS STAYED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/18/18. 7/18/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL BY 7/23/18; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/18/18. 7/18/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 55 Notice of Appeal, filed by TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH, CECELIA PAUL, CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON. USCA Case Number 18-2574 (dmc, ) Modified on 7/17/2018 (dmc, ).
July 14, 2018 Filing 56 Emergency MOTION for Injunction pending appeal filed by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH. Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in support of motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(RIENZI, MARK) Modified on 7/18/2018 (tjd).
July 13, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 53 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0313-12924159. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, and Appeals Clerk. (RIENZI, MARK) Modified on 7/17/2018 (tjd).
July 13, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 53 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0313-12924159. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk.**(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY, SEE DOCUMENT 55 FOR CORRECT NOTICE OF APPEAL)** (WINDHAM, LORI) Modified on 7/17/2018 (tjd).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER OF 7/13/18 THAT PLAINTIFF'S INJUNCTION MOTION IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, AND PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS SHALL FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (DOC. 1) NO LATER THAN TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER. 7/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (DT)
July 13, 2018 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM FILED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 07/13/2018. 07/13/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(dt)
July 12, 2018 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CECELIA PAUL, SHARONELL FULTON, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH, CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES. Waivers sent to All Defendants on 5/30/2018, answers due 7/30/2018. (WINDHAM, LORI) Modified on 7/16/2018 (tjd).
July 11, 2018 Filing 50 Letter to Judge Tucker dated July 11, 2018 by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS re 49 Notice (Other) (FIELD, BENJAMIN) Modified on 7/17/2018 (tjd).
July 10, 2018 Filing 49 Letter to Judge Tucker dated July 10, 2018 by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH (RIENZI, MARK) Modified on 7/13/2018 (tjd).
June 29, 2018 Filing 48 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Intervene filed by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH. (RIENZI, MARK) Modified on 7/5/2018 (tjd).
June 29, 2018 Filing 47 Letter to Judge Tucker dated June 29, 2018 by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS Objecting to Supplemental Declaration (EWING, ELEANOR) Modified on 7/5/2018 (tjd).
June 28, 2018 Filing 46 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH. Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of James Amato)(RIENZI, MARK)
June 28, 2018 Filing 45 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS. Certificate of Service (EWING, ELEANOR)
June 28, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by JANE LOVITCH ISTVAN on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS with Certificate of Service(ISTVAN, JANE)
June 28, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by FRED T. MAGAZINER on behalf of PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE, SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES with Certificate of Service(MAGAZINER, FRED)
June 28, 2018 Filing 42 Letter to Judge Tucker dated June 28, 2018 by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH re Janus v. American Federation of State, County, and Municipal Employees Council Supreme Court decision (Attachments: # 1 Supreme Court Opinion)(RIENZI, MARK) Modified on 7/2/2018 (tjd).
June 27, 2018 Filing 41 Letter to Judge Tucker dated June 27, 2018 by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH re NIFLA v. Becerra Supreme Court decision (Attachments: # 1 Supreme Court decision)(RIENZI, MARK) Modified on 6/29/2018 (tjd).
June 25, 2018 Filing 40 Letter to Judge Tucker dated June 25, 2018 by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH re 36 Notice (Other) in response to City's 6/22 letter (RIENZI, MARK) Modified on 6/26/2018 (tjd).
June 22, 2018 Filing 39 Minute Entry, Hearing re: TRO Motion Hearing for proceedings held before HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER in Courtroom 16B on 6/21/18. Court Reporter: Lynn McCloskey. (kw, )
June 22, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS Regarding New Evidence at Hearing (FIELD, BENJAMIN)
June 21, 2018 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER TRO Motion Hearing was held on 6/19/18 (jaa, ) Modified on 6/22/2018 (jaa, ). COURT REPORTER/ESR.
June 21, 2018 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER TRO Motion Hearing was held on 6/18/18 (jaa, ) Modified on 6/22/2018 (jaa, ). COURT REPORTER/ESR.
June 21, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE by PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE, SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES of Withdrawal of appearance of Frank Cervone as Counsel (ROPER, MARY)
June 20, 2018 Filing 34 Memorandum of Law, or, in the Alternative, Amicus Brief, in Opposition to Plaintiffs' 10 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE, SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES. (fdc) (Main Document 34 replaced on 6/21/2018) (afm, ).
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT PROPOSED INTERVENORS' 28 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THEIR MEMORANDUM OF LAW, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, AMICUS BRIEF, IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS GRANTED IN THAT THE COURT ACCEPTS PROPOSED INTERVENORS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, AMICUS BRIEF, IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ("AMICUS BRIEF") (DOC.28-1), ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A TO THE MOTION FOR LEAVE, AS AN AMICUS BRIEF. THE AMICUS BRIEF SHALL BE DEEMED FILED AS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/20/18.6/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT THE FIRST MOTION 10 IS DISMISSED AS MOOT AND THE AMENDED MOTION 13 SHALL BE TREATED AS PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL FILING FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CASE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MAINTAIN THE FIRST MOTION 10 UNDER SEAL TO PROTECT THE PRIVACY INTERESTS AND IDENTITIES OF CERTAIN MINOR CHILDREN IDENTIFIED IN THE FIRST MOTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/20/18.6/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT THE CITY PARTIES' 19 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/18/18.6/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 18, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by SCHAUNDRA OLIVER on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS with Certificate of Service(OLIVER, SCHAUNDRA)
June 18, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by WILL W. SACHSE on behalf of PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE, SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES with Certificate of Service(SACHSE, WILL)
June 18, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE, SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Proposed Intervenors' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(WIGGLESWORTH, CATHERINE)
June 15, 2018 Filing 27 Memorandum of Law in Support re 14 MOTION to Intervene filed by PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE, SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Answer, # 2 Declaration of Frank P. Cervone, # 3 Declaration of Stephanie Haynes)(TACK-HOOPER, MOLLY) Modified on 6/25/2018 (tjd).
June 15, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. GUERNSEY on behalf of CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service for John A. Guernsey)(GUERNSEY, JOHN)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL APPEAR AT THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 6/18/2018 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 16B, JAMES A. BYRNE U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILA., PA 19106, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLFFS' APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF STEPHANIE H. BARCLAY & DEFTS' APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF LESLIE COOPER ESQ. ARE GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/14/18. 6/15/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (ECF FORM MAILED TO STEPHANIE H. BARCLAY, ESQ.) Modified on 6/15/2018 (kw, ).
June 14, 2018 Filing 24 Letter to Judge Tucker dated June 14, 2018 by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(RIENZI, MARK) Modified on 6/18/2018 (tjd).
June 14, 2018 Filing 23 Letter to Judge Tucker dated June 14, 2018 by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS Regarding Confidential Information (FIELD, BENJAMIN) Modified on 6/18/2018 (tjd).
June 13, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie H. Barclay ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12866336.) filed by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH.Certificate of Service.(CENTRELLA, NICHOLAS)
June 13, 2018 Filing 21 Memorandum of law in opposition to plffs' motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFTS CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2018: # 1 sealed document) (tjd, ).
June 12, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex.1 - Declaration of K. Ali, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1-A, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 1-B, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 1-C, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 1-D, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Declaration of C. Figueroa, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Declaration of B. Field, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 3-A, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 3-B, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(FIELD, BENJAMIN)
June 12, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Seal filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS.Motion for Leave to File Under Seal with Certificate of Service and Proposed Order. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(FIELD, BENJAMIN)
June 12, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Leslie Cooper ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12863444.) filed by PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE, SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES.Certificate of Service.(TACK-HOOPER, MOLLY)
June 12, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANA P. CORTES on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS with Certificate of Service(CORTES, DIANA)
June 11, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY CATHERINE ROPER on behalf of PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE, SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES with Certificate of Service(ROPER, MARY)
June 11, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by MOLLY M. TACK-HOOPER on behalf of PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE, SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES with Certificate of Service(TACK-HOOPER, MOLLY)
June 8, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Intervene filed by PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE, SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES.Certificate of Service.(WIGGLESWORTH, CATHERINE)
June 7, 2018 Filing 13 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit 1 part 1, Amato Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 1 part 2, # 5 Exhibit 1 part 3, # 6 Exhibit 1 part 4, # 7 Exhibit 1 part 5, # 8 Exhibit 1 part 6, # 9 Exhibit 1 part 7, # 10 Exhibit 2, # 11 Exhibit 3, # 12 Exhibit 4, # 13 Exhibit 5, # 14 Exhibit 6)(RIENZI, MARK)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF NICHOLAS R. REAVES, ESQ, LORI H. WINDHAM, ESQ AND MARK L. RIENZI, ESQ ARE GRANTED AND NICHOLAS R. REAVES, ESQ, LORI H. WINDHAM, ESQ AND MARK L. RIENZI, ESQ ARE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYVANIA FOR THE PENDENCY OF THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/6/18. 6/6/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MEMORANDUM OVER 25 PAGES IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TEMPORARARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY NO LATER THAN 6/12/18. THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ON 6/18/18 AT 2:00 PM IN COURTROOM 16B. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/6/18. 6/6/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ).
June 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ELEANOR N. EWING on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS with Certificate of Service(EWING, ELEANOR)
June 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN H. FIELD on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS with Certificate of Service(FIELD, BENJAMIN)
June 5, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of their Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH.PLF's Opposed MTN for Leave and Cert of Service.(CENTRELLA, NICHOLAS)
June 5, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Order Granting 7 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File a Memorandum Over 25 Pages filed by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES.(CENTRELLA, NICHOLAS) Modified on 6/6/2018 (tjd).
June 1, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Mark L. Rienzi ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12842065.) filed by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH.Certificate of Service.(CENTRELLA, NICHOLAS)
June 1, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Lori Windham ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12842042.) filed by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH.Certificate of Service.(CENTRELLA, NICHOLAS)
June 1, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas Reaves ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12842006.) filed by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH.Certificate of Service.(CENTRELLA, NICHOLAS)
May 17, 2018 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS. Three Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/17/18 (jwl, )
May 17, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES.(jwl, )
May 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 178509.), filed by TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH, SHARONELL FULTON, CECELIA PAUL, CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Track Form, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Designation Form, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FULTON et al v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARONELL FULTON
Represented By: STEPHANIE H. BARCLAY
Represented By: NICHOLAS M. CENTRELLA
Represented By: JOHN A. GUERNSEY
Represented By: NICHOLAS R. REAVES
Represented By: MARK L. RIENZI
Represented By: LORI H. WINDHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECELIA PAUL
Represented By: STEPHANIE H. BARCLAY
Represented By: NICHOLAS M. CENTRELLA
Represented By: JOHN A. GUERNSEY
Represented By: NICHOLAS R. REAVES
Represented By: MARK L. RIENZI
Represented By: LORI H. WINDHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONI LYNN SIMMS-BUSCH
Represented By: STEPHANIE H. BARCLAY
Represented By: NICHOLAS M. CENTRELLA
Represented By: JOHN A. GUERNSEY
Represented By: NICHOLAS R. REAVES
Represented By: MARK L. RIENZI
Represented By: LORI H. WINDHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICES
Represented By: STEPHANIE H. BARCLAY
Represented By: NICHOLAS M. CENTRELLA
Represented By: JOHN A. GUERNSEY
Represented By: NICHOLAS R. REAVES
Represented By: MARK L. RIENZI
Represented By: LORI H. WINDHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: DIANA P. CORTES
Represented By: ELEANOR N. EWING
Represented By: BENJAMIN H. FIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES FOR THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: DIANA P. CORTES
Represented By: ELEANOR N. EWING
Represented By: BENJAMIN H. FIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS
Represented By: DIANA P. CORTES
Represented By: ELEANOR N. EWING
Represented By: BENJAMIN H. FIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: SUPPORT CENTER FOR CHILD ADVOCATES
Represented By: LESLIE COOPER
Represented By: MARY CATHERINE ROPER
Represented By: MOLLY M. TACK-HOOPER
Represented By: CATHERINE VERA WIGGLESWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: PHILADELPHIA FAMILY PRIDE
Represented By: LESLIE COOPER
Represented By: MARY CATHERINE ROPER
Represented By: MOLLY M. TACK-HOOPER
Represented By: CATHERINE VERA WIGGLESWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?