BOYER v. ROSS et al
Plaintiff: ANDRE' BOYER
Defendant: JOHN MCGRODY, PHILADELPHIA LICENSE AND INSPECTION BOARD OF REVIEW, LIEUTENANT LISA KING, COMMISSIONER RICHARD ROSS, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PHILADELPHIA POLICE DEPARTMENT GUN PERMIT UNIT and FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LODGE #5
Case Number: 2:2018cv03048
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ANDRE' BOYER (amas)
July 26, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LODGE #5, LISA KING, JOHN MCGRODY, RICHARD ROSS. Forwarded To: US MARSHALS on 7/27/2018 (amas)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO ADD THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA AND THE FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LODGE #5 AS DEFENDANTS. THE PHILADELPHIA POLICE DEPARTMENT GUN PERMIT UNIT AND PHILADELPHIA LICENSE AND INSPECTION BOARD OF REVIEW ARE DISMISSED AS DEFENDANTS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE US MARSHALS FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANTS AT NO COST TO PLAINTIFF, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/24/2018.7/27/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas)
July 18, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANDRE' BOYER. (ahf)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against LISA KING, JOHN MCGRODY, PHILADELPHIA LICENSE AND INSPECTION BOARD OF REVIEW, PHILADELPHIA POLICE DEPARTMENT GUN PERMIT UNIT, RICHARD ROSS, filed by ANDRE' BOYER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY ANDRE' BOYER.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOYER v. ROSS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MCGRODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA LICENSE AND INSPECTION BOARD OF REVIEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT LISA KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER RICHARD ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA POLICE DEPARTMENT GUN PERMIT UNIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LODGE #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE' BOYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?