LOMORO v. DAILY NEWS, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: DIANA LOMORO
Defendant: TRONC, INC. and DAILY NEWS, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03229
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by DAILY NEWS, L.P., TRONC, INC..MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(SEGAL, ELI)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL BE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 9/26/2018 TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF;S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 8/29/2018. 8/29/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC S. MERIN on behalf of DAILY NEWS, L.P., TRONC, INC. with Certificate of Service(MERIN, ERIC)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DAILY NEWS, L.P., TRONC, INC..(SEGAL, ELI)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ELI M. SEGAL on behalf of DAILY NEWS, L.P., TRONC, INC. with Certificate of Service(SEGAL, ELI)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by FELIX CORREA, OF SERVICO, INC. re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon CORPORATION SERVICE CO., C/O JANE DOE, AUTHORIZED AGENT OF DAILY NEWS, L.P. by PERSONAL SERVICE HAND DELIVERY on 08/09/2018 (ROSEN, SIMON)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JOHN J. PENNELL, OF ILLINOIS PROCESS SERVERS, LLC re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon LASHAWN DEVOS, AUTHORIZED AGENT FOR TRONC, INC. by PERSONAL SERVICE HAND DELIVERY on 08/06/2018 (ROSEN, SIMON)
July 30, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DIANA LOMORO. (jwl, )
July 30, 2018 Summons Issued as to DAILY NEWS, L.P., TRONC, INC.. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/31/18 (jwl, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAILY NEWS, L.P., TRONC, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 182316.), filed by DIANA LOMORO.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOMORO v. DAILY NEWS, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRONC, INC.
Represented By: ELI M. SEGAL
Represented By: ERIC S. MERIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAILY NEWS, L.P.
Represented By: ELI M. SEGAL
Represented By: ERIC S. MERIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA LOMORO
Represented By: SIMON ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?