BF ACQUISITION HOLDINGS, LLC et al v. SAATH FIVE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BF ACQUISITION HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: SAATH FIVE, INC., SHIVANI PATEL, SEJAL PATEL, AMIT PATEL, CHIRAG PATEL, TEJAL PATEL, HETAL C. PATEL, ASHISH PATEL, DHRUBESH PATEL, JIGAR PATEL and HETAL PATEL
Case Number: 2:2018cv03312
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH THE CLERK FOR ENTRY OF A DEFAULT IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 55 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. IF THE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT IS NOT FILED WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS, THE COURT WILL ENTER AN ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE AGAINST THE ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/27/18. 9/28/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BF ACQUISITION HOLDINGS, LLC re: James G. Robinson served Summons and Complaint upon AMIT PATEL, ASHISH PATEL, CHIRAG PATEL, DHRUBESH PATEL, HETAL PATEL, HETAL C. PATEL, JIGAR PATEL, SHIVANI PATEL, TEJAL PATEL, SEJAL PATEL, SAATH FIVE, INC. by Personal Service. AMIT PATEL served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; ASHISH PATEL served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; CHIRAG PATEL served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; DHRUBESH PATEL served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; HETAL PATEL served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; HETAL C. PATEL served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; JIGAR PATEL served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; SHIVANI PATEL served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; TEJAL PATEL served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; SEJAL PATEL served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; SAATH FIVE, INC. served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (va, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service: Summonses returned unexectued, as to AMIT PATEL, ASHISH PATEL, CHIRAG PATEL, DHRUBESH PATEL, HETAL PATEL, HETAL C. PATEL, JIGAR PATEL, SHIVANI PATEL, TEJAL PATEL, SEJAL PATEL, SAATH FIVE, INC. (va, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 12(b) Procedural Order (CJL)
August 3, 2018 (11) Summons Issued as to AMIT PATEL, ASHISH PATEL, CHIRAG PATEL, DHRUBESH PATEL, HETAL PATEL, HETAL C. PATEL, JIGAR PATEL, SHIVANI PATEL, TEJAL PATEL, SEJAL PATEL, SAATH FIVE, INC.. Forwarded To: counsel on 8/8/18. (kw, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent MTY FRANCHISING USA, INC. for BF ACQUISITION HOLDINGS, LLC., filed by PLFF BF ACQUISITION HOLDINGS, LLC.(kw, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMIT PATEL, ASHISH PATEL, CHIRAG PATEL, DHRUBESH PATEL, HETAL PATEL, HETAL C. PATEL, JIGAR PATEL, SHIVANI PATEL, TEJAL PATEL, SEJAL PATEL, SAATH FIVE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number PPE182669.), filed by PLFF BF ACQUISITION HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit A3, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G1, #11 Exhibit G2, #12 Exhibit G3, #13 Exhibit G4, #14 Exhibit G5, #15 Exhibit H1, #16 Exhibit H2, #17 Exhibit H3, #18 Exhibit I, #19 Exhibit J1, #20 Exhibit J2, #21 Exhibit J3, #22 Exhibit J4, #23 Exhibit K, #24 Exhibit L, #25 Exhibit M, #26 Exhibit N, #27 Exhibit O, #28 Exhibit P, #29 Civil Cover Sheets)(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BF ACQUISITION HOLDINGS, LLC et al v. SAATH FIVE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAATH FIVE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIVANI PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEJAL PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMIT PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIRAG PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEJAL PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETAL C. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHISH PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHRUBESH PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIGAR PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETAL PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BF ACQUISITION HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?