DOE v. THE LIFE CENTER OF EASTERN DELAWARE COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Defendant: THE LIFE CENTER OF EASTERN DELAWARE COUNTY and COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03404
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Delaware
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3604 (f)(3)(C) Fair Housing Amendments Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY Brief in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC., THE LIFE CENTER OF EASTERN DELAWARE COUNTY. Certificate of Service. (JENNINGS, RUFUS) Modified on 9/13/2018 (lisad, ).
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by JANE DOE of Constitutional Question (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(ROBINETTE, JUSTIN)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 Brief in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JANE DOE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(ROBINETTE, JUSTIN) Modified on 9/11/2018 (lisad, ).
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC., THE LIFE CENTER OF EASTERN DELAWARE COUNTY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(JENNINGS, RUFUS)
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC..(JENNINGS, RUFUS)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE LIFE CENTER OF EASTERN DELAWARE COUNTY.(JENNINGS, RUFUS)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RUFUS A. JENNINGS on behalf of COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC., THE LIFE CENTER OF EASTERN DELAWARE COUNTY with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(JENNINGS, RUFUS)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC.. COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC. waiver sent on 8/15/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (JENNINGS, RUFUS)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE LIFE CENTER OF EASTERN DELAWARE COUNTY. THE LIFE CENTER OF EASTERN DELAWARE COUNTY waiver sent on 8/15/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (JENNINGS, RUFUS)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY together with Brief in Support and Certificate of Service filed by JANE DOE.(ti, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC., THE LIFE CENTER OF EASTERN DELAWARE COUNTY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183015.), filed by JANE DOE.(ti, )
August 13, 2018 Summons Issued as to COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC., THE LIFE CENTER OF EASTERN DELAWARE COUNTY. Two Originals Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/13/18 (ti, )
August 13, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JANE DOE. (ti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE v. THE LIFE CENTER OF EASTERN DELAWARE COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LIFE CENTER OF EASTERN DELAWARE COUNTY
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY ACTION AGENCY OF DELAWARE COUNTY, INC.
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: JUSTIN F. ROBINETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?