FARRA et al v. ACME MARKETS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JERRY FARRA and DONNA FARRA
Defendant: ACME MARKETS, INC., RITE AID CORPORATION, IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. and JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03452
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 14 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (va, )
August 31, 2018 Original record transferred to the District of New Jersey via interdistrict transfer system. (md)
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO - 102): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidisttict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consentof that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. (va, )
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION TO STAY AND CLOSING CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/20/18. 8/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) MAILED TO UNREPS. Modified on 8/21/2018 (md).
August 20, 2018 Filing 11 Copy Re: Documents (Notice of Related Actions) Filed Before the JPML regarding In Re: Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. (ems)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY M. MCNAMEE on behalf of ACME MARKETS, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCNAMEE, GREGORY)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by DONNA FARRA, JERRY FARRA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(MCCORMICK, BRIAN)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by DONNA FARRA, JERRY FARRA.Memorandum, Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Certificate of Service, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(MCCORMICK, BRIAN) Modified on 8/17/2018 (fb).
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN J. MCCORMICK, JR on behalf of DONNA FARRA, JERRY FARRA with Certificate of Service(MCCORMICK, BRIAN)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..Memorandum,Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1)(MILLER, CHANDA)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative and Other Defenses, by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., Jury Demand, Certificate of Service.(MILLER, CHANDA) Modified on 8/21/2018 (md).
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE MCBETH on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. with Certificate of Service(mbh, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Servicefiled by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..(mbh, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(mbh, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal by JOHNSON & JOHNSON and JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 180702165. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE183166)(mbh, )
August 15, 2018 Demand for Trial by Jury (mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FARRA et al v. ACME MARKETS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACME MARKETS, INC.
Represented By: GREGORY M. MCNAMEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Represented By: KATHERINE MCBETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Represented By: KATHERINE MCBETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY FARRA
Represented By: BRIAN J. MCCORMICK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA FARRA
Represented By: BRIAN J. MCCORMICK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?