PEARSON v. MCKEE
Plaintiff: MICHAEL K. PEARSON
Defendant: SHARMIL MCKEE
Case Number: 2:2018cv03454
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by MICHAEL K. PEARSON. Appellee Brief due by 11/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(GUNTER, KARIN)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 Briefing Schedule 9/12/2018 Entered and copies mailed. (ahf)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 Original Bankruptcy record together with designation of record on appeal received. (Attachments: #1 entire main docket, appellees designation and items, #2 counsel sheet entire)(ahf)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of MICHAEL K. PEARSON from the order of Bankruptcy Judge JEAN K. FITZSIMON filed on 8/1/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, ) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/15/2018) (jwl, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/15/2018) (jwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEARSON v. MCKEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL K. PEARSON
Represented By: KARIN M. GUNTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARMIL MCKEE
Represented By: GLENN A. BROWN
Represented By: SHARMIL D. MCKEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?