YOUSE et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: CARRIE YOUSE, MARK YOUSE and CARRIES YOUSE
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON and WAL-MART
Case Number: 2:2018cv03578
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Certificate of Service)(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
October 10, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim by WAL-MART.(FERTEL, JILL)
October 9, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON by WAL-MART.(FERTEL, JILL)
October 9, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by NANCY ELIZABETH ZANGRILLI on behalf of WAL-MART (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ZANGRILLI, NANCY)
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by JILL HEATHER FERTEL on behalf of WAL-MART with Jury Demand; Certificate of Service(FERTEL, JILL)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 First MOTION to Remand filed by WAL-MART. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Brief in Support of its Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(ZANGRILLI, NANCY)
October 4, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCDONNELL on behalf of WAL-MART with Certificate of Service(MCDONNELL, PATRICK)
October 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY ELIZABETH ZANGRILLI on behalf of WAL-MART with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(ZANGRILLI, NANCY)
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 First MOTION to Remand filed by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #11 ) IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT, IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., SHALL HAVE UNTIL 10/11/2018, TO FILE AN ANSWER TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/1/2018.10/1/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint (Uncontested Motion) filed by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Concurrence, Certificate of Service.(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (amas)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(HANNA, THOMAS)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS P. HANNA on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON with Certificate of Service(HANNA, THOMAS)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION to Remand filed by CARRIES YOUSE, MARK YOUSE.Memorandum of Law Certificate of Service.(ROWE, MICHAEL)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. ROWE on behalf of CARRIES YOUSE, MARK YOUSE with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(ROWE, MICHAEL)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. #3 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/14/2018.9/17/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
September 13, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, WAL-MART. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 9/14/2018 (amas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, WAL-MART, filed by CARRIES YOUSE, MARK YOUSE.(amas)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent IMERYS USA, INC., Corporate Parent IMERYS S.A., Corporate Parent IMERYS MINERALS HOLDING LIMITED for IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.. by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC..(ahf)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 180701438. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183528) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUSE et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRIE YOUSE
Represented By: JASON HODRINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK YOUSE
Represented By: JASON HODRINSKY
Represented By: MICHAEL A. ROWE
Represented By: JASON MICHAEL HODRINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRIES YOUSE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. ROWE
Represented By: JASON MICHAEL HODRINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: THOMAS P. HANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART
Represented By: JILL HEATHER FERTEL
Represented By: PATRICK J. MCDONNELL
Represented By: NANCY ELIZABETH ZANGRILLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?