SULLIVAN v. A. W. CHESTERTON, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JACKIE L. SULLIVAN
Defendant: SQUARE D COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY, GOODYEAR CANADA, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, AURORA PUMP, GARDNER DENVER NASH, GENERAL DYNAMICS, JOHNSON CONTROLS SUCCESSOR TO YORK, CRANE CO., CLARK CONTROLLER CO., HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES, WARREN PUMPS LLC, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC., BATH IRON WORKS, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, CARRIER CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMPS INC., HERCULES, ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, MINNESOTA MINING AND M ANUFACTURING, CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, JOHN CRANE, INC., NORTHERN PUMP, BF GOODRICH COMPANY, GARDNER DENVER, COONEY BROTHERS, KUNKLE VALVE, WEIL PUMP, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., ITT INC., EDWARDS VALVE, NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION, J.A. SEXAUER, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., JENKINS PUMPS, A. W. CHESTERTON, INC., ITT BELL GOSSET, INGERSOLL-RAND & CO., FLOWSERVE, JENKINS VALVES, VIAD CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., WEIL MCLAIN and MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING
Case Number: 2:2018cv03622
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Referring Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of FLOWSERVE with Certificate of Service, for ANCHOR DARLING VALVE COMPANY only, improperly named as Flowserve successor to Anchor Darling(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
October 17, 2018 Filing 65 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and IMO Holdings, Inc. by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
October 17, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE JENKINS PUMPS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/16/18. 10/17/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) Modified on 10/19/2018 (md).
October 15, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE by JOHNSON CONTROLS SUCCESSOR TO YORK of Substitution of Counsel, Certificate of Service. Appearance of STEVEN LUXTON, and Withdrawal of A. Kai Seelaus. (LUXTON, STEVEN) Modified on 10/16/2018 (md).
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER THAT CIVIL ACTION NUMBERS 18-3622 AND 18-3685 SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED UNDER 18-3622 FOR ALL PURPOSES. ALL PLEADINGS, MOTIONS, OR OTHER PAPERS ARE TO BE FILED UNDER CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 18-3622. CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 18-3685 SHALL BE STATISTICALLY CLOSED AND THE CAPTION OF CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 18-3622 SHALL BE AMENDED TO INCLUDE ALL DEFENDANTS FROM CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 18-3685. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED THAT 18-3622 ECF NO. #48 AND 18-3685 ECF NO. 16, HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES MOTIONS TO DISMISS CROSS-CLAIMS ARE DENIED AS PREMATURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/12/18. 10/15/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY F. TURNER on behalf of JOHN CRANE, INC. (TURNER, TIFFANY)
October 12, 2018 Filing 60 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Cleaver-Holdings, Inc. with Certificate of Service by CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC..(VALINIS, SUSAN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(VALINIS, SUSAN) Modified on 10/17/2018 (md).
October 10, 2018 Filing 58 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Ingersoll Rand PLC with Certificate of Service by INGERSOLL-RAND & CO..(RYAN, DANIEL)
October 10, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. RYAN, JR on behalf of INGERSOLL-RAND & CO. (RYAN, DANIEL)
October 8, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by LEAH A. LEWIS on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. with Jury Demand(LEWIS, LEAH)
October 8, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. with Jury Demand(VALINIS, SUSAN)
October 8, 2018 Filing 54 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JENKINS PUMPS. (JASONS, CATHERINE) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 10/15/2018 (md).
October 4, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Cross Claims filed by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DISIPIO, BASIL)
October 3, 2018 Filing 52 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (va, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CARRIER CORPORATION, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(DEPFER, JOAN) Modified on 10/2/2018 (md).
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER TO HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 09/25/2018. 09/25/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE by HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES Joint Letter to Court from counsels for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Viad Corporation and Plaintiff regarding merge of Civil Action No. 2:18-cv-03685-ER into Civil Action No. 2:18-cv-03622-GEKP (WASKOM, THOMAS)
September 20, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Cross Claims filed by HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES.Memorandum, Certificate and Proposed Order.(WASKOM, THOMAS)
September 19, 2018 Filing 47 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by BF GOODRICH COMPANY.(DEZII, DAWN)
September 19, 2018 Filing 46 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BF GOODRICH COMPANY.(DEZII, DAWN)
September 18, 2018 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(WASKOM, THOMAS)
September 18, 2018 Filing 44 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including FLOWSERVE CORPORATION with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FLOWSERVE.(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
September 17, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. SCHEETS on behalf of WARREN PUMPS LLC (SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
September 17, 2018 Filing 42 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT Inc. with Certificate of Service by GOULDS PUMPS INC..(LUXTON, STEVEN)
September 17, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. LUXTON on behalf of GOULDS PUMPS INC. with Certificate of Service(LUXTON, STEVEN)
September 17, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTIAN A WEIMANN on behalf of WARREN PUMPS LLC (WEIMANN, CHRISTIAN)
September 12, 2018 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY.(SEE PAPER #39 FOR PDF)(md)
September 12, 2018 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(GRIES, ALAN) Modified on 9/17/2018 (md).
September 12, 2018 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY.(GRIES, ALAN)
September 12, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by ALAN R. GRIES on behalf of SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY with Certificate of Service(GRIES, ALAN)
September 12, 2018 Filing 36 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA.(ARRIAGA, ALBA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by ALBA E. ARRIAGA on behalf of HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA with Certificate of Service(ARRIAGA, ALBA)
September 11, 2018 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint of Huntington Ingalls filed by JACKIE L. SULLIVAN. (Attachments: #1 Order)(PAUL, ROBERT)
September 11, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BF GOODRICH COMPANY, Jury Demand, Denial of Crossclaims, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DEZII, DAWN) Modified on 9/13/2018 (md).
September 6, 2018 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation with Certificate of Service by CLARK CONTROLLER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FINCH, EDWARD)
September 6, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CLARK CONTROLLER CO., Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FINCH, EDWARD) Modified on 9/10/2018 (md).
September 6, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD T. FINCH on behalf of CLARK CONTROLLER CO. with Jury Demand (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FINCH, EDWARD)
September 6, 2018 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(DISIPIO, BASIL) Modified on 9/10/2018 (md).
September 5, 2018 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL.(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
September 5, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM R. ADAMS on behalf of ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL with JURY DEMAND(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
September 5, 2018 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including United Technologies Corp. by CARRIER CORPORATION.(DEPFER, JOAN)
September 5, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by JOAN P. DEPFER on behalf of CARRIER CORPORATION (DEPFER, JOAN)
September 5, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE M. PITT on behalf of EDWARDS VALVE (PITT, TERENCE)
September 5, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL on behalf of EDWARDS VALVE (LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
September 4, 2018 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT Inc. with Certificate of Service by ITT BELL GOSSET, ITT INC..(LUXTON, STEVEN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. LUXTON on behalf of ITT BELL GOSSET, ITT INC. with Certificate of Service(LUXTON, STEVEN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 19 JOINDER in Removal and Notice of Independant Grounds for Removal filed by CRANE CO., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Pantaleoni, #3 Exhibit C1a-Sargent, #4 Exhibit C1b-Sargent, #5 Exhibit C1c-Sargent, #6 Exhibit C1d-Sargent, #7 Exhibit C2a-Sargent, #8 Exhibit C2b-Sargent, #9 Exhibit C2c-Sargent, #10 Exhibit D1a-Forman, #11 Exhibit D1b-Forman, #12 Exhibit D1c-Forman, #13 Exhibit D2a-Forman, #14 Exhibit D2b-Forman)(BRUCH, G.) Modified on 8/31/2018 (md).
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GENERAL DYNAMICS.(BAILEY, MEGAN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BATH IRON WORKS.(BAILEY, MEGAN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 JOINDER of Removal and Independent Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1442 and 1446 filed by BATH IRON WORKS, GENERAL DYNAMICS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit 1 TO EXHIBIT D, #6 Exhibit 2 TO EXHIBIT D, #7 Exhibit 3 TO EXHIBIT D, #8 Exhibit 4 TO EXHIBIT D, #9 Exhibit 5 TO EXHIBIT D, #10 Exhibit 6 TO EXHIBIT D, #11 Exhibit 7 TO EXHIBIT D, #12 Exhibit 8 TO EXHIBIT D, #13 Exhibit 9 TO EXHIBIT D, #14 Exhibit 10 TO EXHIBIT D, #15 Exhibit 11 TO EXHIBIT D, #16 Exhibit 12 TO EXHIBIT D, #17 Exhibit 13 TO EXHIBIT D, #18 Exhibit 14 TO EXHIBIT D, #19 Exhibit 15 TO EXHIBIT D, #20 Exhibit 16 TO EXHIBIT D, #21 Exhibit 17 TO EXHIBIT D, #22 Exhibit 18 TO EXHIBIT D, #23 Exhibit 19 TO EXHIBIT D, #24 Exhibit 20 TO EXHIBIT D, #25 Exhibit 21 TO EXHIBIT D, #26 Exhibit 22 TO EXHIBIT D, #27 Exhibit 23 TO EXHIBIT D, #28 Exhibit E, #29 Exhibit F, #30 Exhibit G, #31 Exhibit H)(BAILEY, MEGAN) Modified on 8/31/2018 (md).
August 30, 2018 Filing 15 PRAECIPE for Alias Summons by JACKIE L. SULLIVAN. (PAUL, ROBERT) Modified on 8/31/2018 (md).
August 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by DAWN DEZII on behalf of BF GOODRICH COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DEZII, DAWN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE CO., Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(BRUCH, G.) Modified on 8/31/2018 (md).
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE CO. with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(BRUCH, G.) Modified on 8/31/2018 (md).
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JOHNSON CONTROLS SUCCESSOR TO YORK.(SEELAUS, A.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by A. KAI SEELAUS on behalf of JOHNSON CONTROLS SUCCESSOR TO YORK with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(SEELAUS, A.)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES.Brief and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(WASKOM, THOMAS)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING with Jury Demand with Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1, Proof of Service, filed by DEFT HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES.(kw, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County, PA, Certificate of Service, case number 1807-2918. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number PPE183599) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(kw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheets) (kw, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2018: #3 Exhibit - Part 1, #4 Exhibit - Part 2, #5 Exhibit - Part 3, #6 Exhibit - Part 4, #7 Exhibit - Part 5) (kw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SULLIVAN v. A. W. CHESTERTON, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE D COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY
Represented By: ALAN R. GRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR CANADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: WILLIAM R. ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER NASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL DYNAMICS
Represented By: MEGAN KATHLEEN BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON CONTROLS SUCCESSOR TO YORK
Represented By: A. KAI SEELAUS
Represented By: STEVEN A. LUXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK CONTROLLER CO.
Represented By: EDWARD T. FINCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES
Represented By: ALEXANDRA B. CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: THOMAS R. WASKOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Represented By: CHRISTIAN A WEIMANN
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SCHEETS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BATH IRON WORKS
Represented By: MEGAN KATHLEEN BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: JOAN P. DEPFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS INC.
Represented By: STEVEN A. LUXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERCULES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING AND M ANUFACTURING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Represented By: LEAH A. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: ALBA E. ARRIAGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHERN PUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BF GOODRICH COMPANY
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COONEY BROTHERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KUNKLE VALVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL PUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT INC.
Represented By: STEVEN A. LUXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARDS VALVE
Represented By: BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL
Represented By: TERENCE M. PITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. SEXAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENKINS PUMPS
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. W. CHESTERTON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT BELL GOSSET
Represented By: STEVEN A. LUXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND & CO.
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE
Represented By: BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENKINS VALVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL MCLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKIE L. SULLIVAN
Represented By: ROBERT E. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?