JOHNSON v. MARSDEN NORTHEAST, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL JOHNSON
Defendant: MARSDEN NORTHEAST, L.L.C., SCIOTO SERVICES, L.L.C., NKF GLOBAL WORKPLACE SOLUTIONS and NEWMARK & COMPANY REAL ESTATE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03643
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MEGHAN MILLS on behalf of NEWMARK & COMPANY REAL ESTATE, INC. (MILLS, MEGHAN)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL JOHNSON. NEWMARK & COMPANY REAL ESTATE, INC. waiver sent on 10/4/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (LEASE, ADAM)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by KELSEY BEERER on behalf of NEWMARK & COMPANY REAL ESTATE, INC. (BEERER, KELSEY)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL RONALD MILLER on behalf of NEWMARK & COMPANY REAL ESTATE, INC. (MILLER, MICHAEL)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED IN PART. WE AMEND THE CAPTION AND REPLACE THE NAMED DEFENDANT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NKF GLOBAL WORKPLACE SOLUTIONS IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NEWMARK & COMPANY REAL ESTATE, INC. IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT AND SHALL RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 11/1/2018.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/4/2018. 10/5/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(kp, )
September 13, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to MARSDEN NORTHEAST, L.L.C., NKF GLOBAL WORKPLACE SOLUTIONS, SCIOTO SERVICES, L.L.C.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 9/14/2018. (kp, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MARSDEN NORTHEAST, L.L.C., NKF GLOBAL WORKPLACE SOLUTIONS, SCIOTO SERVICES, L.L.C., filed by MICHAEL JOHNSON.(kp, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL JOHNSON. MARSDEN NORTHEAST, L.L.C. waiver sent on 8/24/2018, answer due 10/23/2018; SCIOTO SERVICES, L.L.C. waiver sent on 8/24/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (KARPF, ARI)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM C. LEASE on behalf of MICHAEL JOHNSON (LEASE, ADAM)
August 24, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MICHAEL JOHNSON. (jwl, )
August 24, 2018 Summons Issued as to MARSDEN NORTHEAST, L.L.C., NKF GLOBAL WORKPLACE SOLUTIONS, SCIOTO SERVICES, L.L.C.. Three Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/27/18 (jwl, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARSDEN NORTHEAST, L.L.C., NKF GLOBAL WORKPLACE SOLUTIONS, SCIOTO SERVICES, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13007411.), filed by MICHAEL JOHNSON.(KARPF, ARI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. MARSDEN NORTHEAST, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL JOHNSON
Represented By: ARI RISSON KARPF
Represented By: ADAM C. LEASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSDEN NORTHEAST, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCIOTO SERVICES, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NKF GLOBAL WORKPLACE SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWMARK & COMPANY REAL ESTATE, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL RONALD MILLER
Represented By: KELSEY BEERER
Represented By: MEGHAN MILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?