COLE v. CARSON et al

Plaintiff: JAMES T. COLE
Defendant: AMAZON INC AND/OR CORP., T.M.G. PUBLISHING FIRM, RODNEY "FROG&quot CARSON and T.M.G. PUBMISHING FIRM
Case Number: 2:2018cv03668
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 21 PLANTIFF JAMES T. COLE'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE ALREADY RECORD.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(jpd, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #19 Order on Motion to Reassign Case by JAMES T. COLE. IFP PENDING Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd, )
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERED THAT PLAITNIFF'S MOTION TO REASSIGN CASE (DOC. NO.16) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/25/18. 9/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (jpd )
September 21, 2018 Filing 18 Affidavit filed by JAMES T. COLE. (mbh, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION FOR DISCOVERY TO FURTHER SUPPORT RESTRAIN AND/OR INJUNCTION FILED BY JAMES T. COLE, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(mbh, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION FOR CASE REASSIGNMENT FILED BY JAMES T. COLE, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(mbh, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 15 Complaint against AMAZON INC AND/OR CORP., RODNEY "FROG" CARSON and T.M.G. PUBMISHING FIRM filed by JAMES T. COLE.(mbh, ).
September 21, 2018 Filing 14 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by JAMES T. COLE. (mbh, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY JAMES T. COLE, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(mbh, )
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT COLE'S SECOND APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (DOC. NO. #8 ) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IF COLE SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE SHALL, WITHIN 21 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. ALTERNATIVELY, COLE CAN PROCEED BY SUBMITTING $400.00 TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 21 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/7/2018.9/7/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/11/2018) (amas, ).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND/OR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (DOC. NO. #10 ) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/7/2018.9/7/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND/OR INJUNCTION RELIEF FILED BY JAMES T. COLE.MOMORANDUM, CERT. OF SERVICE.(pr, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by JAMES T. COLE. (pr, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY JAMES T. COLE..(pr, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMAZON INC AND/OR CORP., RODNEY "FROG" CARSON, T.M.G. PUBMISHING FIRM filed by JAMES T. COLE.(pr, )
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND/OR INJUNCTION RELIEF (DOC. NO. #3 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/29/2018.8/30/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILING TO FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT. IF PLAINTIFF SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS HE SHALL, WITHIN 30 DAYS, EITHER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT OR, SUBMIT $400.00 TO THE CLERK OF COURT. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/29/2018.8/30/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND/OR INJUNCTION RELIEF FILED BY JAMES T. COLE. MEMORANDUM. (ahf)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against AMAZON INC AND/OR CORP., RODNEY "FROG" CARSON, T.M.G. PUBMISHING FIRM, filed by JAMES T. COLE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets, #2 Envelope)(ahf)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY JAMES T. COLE.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLE v. CARSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON INC AND/OR CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.M.G. PUBLISHING FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODNEY "FROG&quot CARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.M.G. PUBMISHING FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES T. COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?