RICH v. BERRYHILL

Plaintiff: ELIZABETH J. RICH
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv03744
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 8 US Marshal Return Re: US MARSHAL RETURN: Summons and Complaint Served upon the Commissioner of Social Security on 10/16/18 via FEDEX and the Atty. General on 10/15/18 via FEDEX. See attached receipt. (jaa, )
October 12, 2018 7 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (ti, )
October 10, 2018 6 Procedural Order 10/10/18 Entered and copies mailed and e-mailed. (ti, )
October 10, 2018 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, One Original Given to the U.S. Attorney and Two Originals Forwarded To: US Marahals on 10/10/18 (ti, )
October 10, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERING PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #4 , IT IS ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION #4 IS GRANTED AND SHE IS GRANTED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; THE CLERK SHALL ISSUE THE SUMMONS; MINDFUL OF THE LEAVE GRANTED BY THIS ORDER, THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA ONLY SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UPON THE DEFENDANT AT NO COST TO AND ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/10/18.10/10/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
October 9, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ELIZABETH J. RICH.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(GORNSTEIN, SHARON) Modified on 10/10/2018 (lisad, ).
September 7, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERING PLAINTIFF ELIZABETH J. RICH'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #1 , IT IS ORDERED THAT MS. RICH'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #1 IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUFFICIENT FINANCIAL INFORMATION. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND MS. RICH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. IF MS. RICH SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SHE SHALL NO LATER THAN 10/10/2018, COMPLETE THE LONG FORM IN A MANNER DESCRIBING HOW SHE IS SUPPORTING HERSELF AND CLARIFING THE ISSUES NOTED ABOVE. IF MS. RICH IS SUPPORTED BY OTHERS, SHE SHOULD DESCRIBE THESE FACTS IN HER MOTION. ALTERNATIVELY, MS. RICH MAY PROCEED BY PAYING $400 TO THE CLERK OF COURT NO LATER THAN 10/10/2018, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/7/18.9/7/18 ENTERED AND IFP FORMS MAILED TO PLAINTIFF & E-MAILED.(ti, )
August 31, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL (IFP PENDING), filed by PLFF ELIZABETH J. RICH.(kw, )
August 31, 2018 1 STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, FILED BY PLFF ELIZABETH J. RICH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICH v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH J. RICH
Represented By: SHARON GORNSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?