NGUYEN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: TONY VAN NGUYEN
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv03802
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: THOMAS J RUETER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 US Marshal Return Re: Commissoner of Social Security served on 10/3/18; Atty Gen servied on 10/1/18. (va, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 Social Security Magistrate Consent by TONY VAN NGUYEN.. (va, )
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL INSOFAR AS THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL REFER THIS MATTER TO THE ATTORNEY PANEL FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES FOR POSSIBLE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 9/12/18. 9/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. COPY TO PRO SE WRIT CLERK. (va, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 Social Security Procedural Order 9/11/18 Entered and copies e-mailed. (jaa, )
September 11, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 2 U.S. MARSHALS AND 1 U.S. ATTORNEYS (jaa, )
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONSES AND THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(I). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 9/11/18.9/11/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(jaa, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment by TONY VAN NGUYEN (Attachments: #1 Consent)(ahf)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES FILED BY TONY VAN NGUYEN.(ahf)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by TONY VAN NGUYEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY TONY VAN NGUYEN.(ahf) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/7/2018) (md, ). Modified on 9/7/2018 (md).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NGUYEN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY VAN NGUYEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?