PHARMACEUTICAL MANUFACTURING RESEARCH SERVICES, INC. v. UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al

Plaintiff: PHARMACEUTICAL MANUFACTURING RESEARCH SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, ALEX M. AZAR, II, JANET WOODCOCK and SCOTT GOTTLIEB
Case Number: 2:2018cv03917
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, SCOTT GOTTLIEB, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, JANET WOODCOCK.certificate of service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: FDA Denial of Hearing Request 83 Fed. Reg. 54598 (Oct. 30 2018), #2 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal)(ROSS, DOUGLAS)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS ROSS on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II, SCOTT GOTTLIEB, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, JANET WOODCOCK (ROSS, DOUGLAS)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, )
September 12, 2018 Summons Issued as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, SCOTT GOTTLIEB, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, JANET WOODCOCK, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/13/18, one given to AUSA (jwl, )
September 12, 2018 Summons Issued as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, SCOTT GOTTLIEB, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, JANET WOODCOCK. Four Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/12/18 (jwl, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PHARMACEUTICAL MANUFACTURING RESEARCH SERVICES, INC..(jwl, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, SCOTT GOTTLIEB, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, JANET WOODCOCK ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 184580.), filed by PHARMACEUTICAL MANUFACTURING RESEARCH SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHARMACEUTICAL MANUFACTURING RESEARCH SERVICES, INC. v. UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHARMACEUTICAL MANUFACTURING RESEARCH SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: NATALIE S. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: DOUGLAS ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: DOUGLAS ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET WOODCOCK
Represented By: DOUGLAS ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT GOTTLIEB
Represented By: DOUGLAS ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?