STEPHENS v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: KENDALL KIANA STEPHENS
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL and COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv03954
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH T HEY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US Marshals re: served Summons & Complaint upon Atty. General on 10/1/18 & Commissioner of Social Security by FedEx on 10/3/18 (ti, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 Social Security Magistrate Consent by KENDALL KIANA STEPHENS. (ti, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE FORM WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. FAILURE TO COMPLETE AND FILE THE FORM AS ORDERED HEREIN SHALL BE DEEMED CONSENT TO THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND THE ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL EXERCISE JURISDICTION FOR ALL PURPOSES UNDER 28 U.S.C. 636(c). SEE ROELL V. WITHROW, 538 U.S. 580 (2003). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 10/9/18. 10/10/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ti, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2018: #1 Consent) (ti, ).
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (ti, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Procedural Order 9/17/18 Entered and copies e-mailed. (ti, )
September 17, 2018 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, One Original Given to the U.S. Attorney and Two Originals Forwarded To: US Marshals on 9/17/18 (ti, )
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND COMPLAINT, IT IS ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(i). THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 9/14/18.9/17/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment by KENDALL KIANA STEPHENS (Attachments: #1 Consent)(mbh, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 Complaint against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by KENDALL KIANA STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Managment Track form, #3 Designation form)(mbh, ) Modified on 9/17/2018 (lisad, ).
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS FILED BY KENDALL KIANA STEPHENS.(mbh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEPHENS v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENDALL KIANA STEPHENS
Represented By: HOWARD A. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?