CROZER-CHESTER NURSES ASSOCIATION/PENNSYLVANIA ASSOCIATION OF STAFF NURSES AND ALLIED PROFESSIONALS v. PROSPECT CMC, LLC
Plaintiff: CROZER-CHESTER NURSES ASSOCIATION/PENNSYLVANIA ASSOCIATION OF STAFF NURSES AND ALLIED PROFESSIONALS
Defendant: PROSPECT CMC, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv04039
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT ATTORNEY LOUIS J. CANNON'S APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR PROSPECT CMC, LLC IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 11/2/2018. 11/5/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT ATTORNEY CHARLES M. GUZAK'S APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR PROSPECT CMC, LLC IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 11/2/2018. 11/5/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles M. Guzak by PROSPECT CMC, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13145043.). (HERROLD, TYSON)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Louis J. Cannon by PROSPECT CMC, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13145020.). (HERROLD, TYSON)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED THAT TEH PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/19/2018 IS CANCELLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/31/2018. 10/31/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BE EXTENDED UNTIL 11/21/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/26/2018. 10/30/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CROZER-CHESTER NURSES ASSOCIATION/PENNSYLVANIA ASSOCIATION OF STAFF NURSES AND ALLIED PROFESSIONALS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(DEMKOVITZ, PETER)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/19/2018 03:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS (ROOM 9613) BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH.(pc, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by PROSPECT CMC, LLC.(HERROLD, TYSON)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by PROSPECT CMC, LLC.(HERROLD, TYSON) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE WITH CORRECT CASE NUMBER IN CAPTION* Modified on 10/17/2018 (lisad, ).
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Heaven Sent re: served Summons upon Prospect CMC by personal service on 10-5-18, answer due 10/26/18. (KOHN, THOMAS) Modified on 10/11/2018 (afm, ).
September 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to PROSPECT CMC, LLC. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/19/18 (jwl, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PROSPECT CMC, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 184975.), filed by CROZER-CHESTER NURSES ASSOCIATION/PENNSYLVANIA ASSOCIATION OF STAFF NURSES AND ALLIED PROFESSIONALS. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROZER-CHESTER NURSES ASSOCIATION/PENNSYLVANIA ASSOCIATION OF STAFF NURSES AND ALLIED PROFESSIONALS v. PROSPECT CMC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CROZER-CHESTER NURSES ASSOCIATION/PENNSYLVANIA ASSOCIATION OF STAFF NURSES AND ALLIED PROFESSIONALS
Represented By: JONATHAN WALTERS
Represented By: PETER H. DEMKOVITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROSPECT CMC, LLC
Represented By: TYSON Y. HERROLD
Represented By: CHARLES M. GUZAK
Represented By: LOUIS J. CANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?