KERVIN v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN KERVIN
Defendant: BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY, ANGUS FIRE, CHEMGUARD, INC., ANSUL, 3M COMPANY and NATIONAL FOAM, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv04355
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Michael L. Carpenter ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13138923.) filed by BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY.Applicants Statement, Sponsors Statement, Motion, Certificate of Service and Order.(COLICCHIO, PHILIP)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Ellen Nunno Corbo ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13138876.) filed by BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY.Applicants Statement, Sponsors Statement, Motion, Certificate of Service and Order.(COLICCHIO, PHILIP)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS CHEMGUARD, INC.; NATIONAL FOAM, INC.; AND 3M COMPANY TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT, BY MOTION OR OTHERWISE, SHALL BE 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND IS DECIDED BY THIS COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 10/24/18. 10/24/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP M. COLICCHIO on behalf of BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY with Certificate of Service(COLICCHIO, PHILIP)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Complaint)(kw, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of 3M COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTOGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 10/15/18. 10/15/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
October 9, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHEMGUARD, INC., KATHLEEN KERVIN. (jwl, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHEMGUARD, INC. from Common Pleas Montgomery County, case number 2018-20572. Certificate of Service.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 186048)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KERVIN v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Represented By: PHILIP M. COLICCHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGUS FIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEMGUARD, INC.
Represented By: ERIN P. LOUCKS
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANSUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL FOAM, INC.
Represented By: KEITH E. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN KERVIN
Represented By: W. STEVEN BERMAN
Represented By: MARK R. CUKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?