IN RE: JAMES ALLEN HINCHLIFFE
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE and WILLIAM C. MILLER
Appellant: JAMES ALLEN HINCHLIFFE
Case Number: 2:2018cv04376
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN LIGHT OF APPELLEE'S DESIGNATION OF ADDITIONAL ITEMS TO BE INCLUDED IN THE RECORD ON APPEAL PURSUANT TO FED.R.BANKR.P. 8009 FILED BY JAMES ALLEN HINCHLIFFE,CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(mbh, )
November 23, 2018 Filing 5 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL RECEIVED AND SUPPLEMENTAL JAMES ALLEN HINCHLIFFE from the order of Bankruptcy Judge ASHELY M. CHAN filed on 9/24/18. (Attachments: #1 COUNSEL SHEET, #2 CONT OF DESIGN, #3 CONT DESIGN, #4 CONT DESIGN, #5 CONT DESIGN, #6 CONTI DESIGN)(jaa, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 Briefing Schedule 11/7/2018 Entered and copies mailed. (ahf)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Original Bankruptcy record together with designation of record on appeal received. (Attachments: #1 Counsel Sheet, Entire Docket and Designation)(ahf)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of JAMES ALLEN HINCHLIFFE from the order of Bankruptcy Judge Ashely M. Chan filed on October 9, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Entire Docket Sheet, Notice of Appeal, Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: JAMES ALLEN HINCHLIFFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: WILLIAM C. MILLER
Represented By: WILLIAM C. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JAMES ALLEN HINCHLIFFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?