COLON v. MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Plaintiff: CARMELO COLON
Defendant: MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv04489
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jl, )
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED 5/6/2019; ALL DAUBERT MOTIONS AND MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE BY 6/18/2019. THE PARTIES SHALL PREPARE AND FILE WITH THE CLERK OF COURT THEIR JOINT PRETRIAL MEMORANDA, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER AND LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16.1(c) AND ANY AND ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE ON OR BEFORE 7/2/2019. THE CASE SHALL BE PLACED IN THE COURT'S TRIAL POOL ON 7/16/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/13/18. 11/15/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER Pretrial Conference held on 11/5/2018. (sg, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/5/2018 at 11:30 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER.(sc, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ZIEMBA, DENNIS)
October 19, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (jwl, ) Modified on 10/22/2018 (lisad, ).
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORPORATION for MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC.. with Certificate of Service by MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC..(jwl, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC. from Common Pleas Philadcelphia, case number 180702503. Certificate of Service.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 186534)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLON v. MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMELO COLON
Represented By: MITCHELL LEE GOLDFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: DENNIS P. ZIEMBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?