SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC v. RETROPHIN, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Defendant: MARTIN SHKRELI, RETROPHIN, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY and ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC.
Petitioner: LESLEY ZHU
Case Number: 2:2018cv04553
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDERED THAT THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS RETOPHIN, MISSION, AND ALAMO ARE DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND DEFENDANT SHKRELI'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS STAYED FOR NINETY DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/11/19. 12/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/11/19. 12/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 95 Spring Pharmaceuticals, Llc.'s Reply Brief in Support of its Supplemental Brief establishing Article III Standing and in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (fdc) (tjd, ).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT RETROPHIN, INC.'S #87 MOTION TO SEAL RETROPHIN'S OPPOSITION TO SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ESTABLISHING ARTICLE III STANDING AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF RETROPHIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 9/26/19.9/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC OF FILING UNDER SEAL (MATHAS, KURT)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S LETTER REQUESTING TIME TO FILE A SHORT REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IS GRANTED AND SPRING SHALL FILE THEIR SHORT REPLY NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 27, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 9/25/19. 9/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 9/26/2019 (jaa, ).
September 20, 2019 Filing 91 RETROPHIN'S OPPOSITION TO SPRING PHARMACEUTICAL'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ESTABLISHING ARTICLE III STANDING AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF RETROPHIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by RETROPHIN, INC. (jaa, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #1 sealed document, #2 sealed document, #3 sealed document, #4 sealed document, #5 sealed document, #6 sealed document, #7 sealed document, #8 sealed document, #9 sealed document, #10 sealed document, #11 sealed document, #12 sealed document, #13 sealed document, #14 sealed document, #15 sealed document, #16 sealed document, #17 sealed document, #18 sealed document, #19 sealed document, #20 sealed document, #21 sealed document, #22 sealed document, #23 sealed document) (tjd, ).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING NON-PARTY LESLEY ZHU'S PETITION FOR REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 9/19/19. 9/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY re #87 MOTION to Seal Document (Notice of Joinder to Retrophin, Inc.'s Opposition to Spring Pharmaceuticals' Supplemental Brief Establishing Article III Standing and In Further Support of Retrophin's Motion to Dismiss) (D'AMBRA, ANDREA)
September 20, 2019 Filing 88 Notice of Joinder in Retrophin's Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief Establishing Article III Standing and in Further Support re #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MARTIN SHKRELI. (BUCKLEY, PETER) Modified on 9/23/2019 (tjd).
September 20, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION to Seal Document filed by RETROPHIN, INC..CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(COE, RICHARD)
September 16, 2019 Filing 86 STIPULATION re #82 Application/Petition for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs by LESLEY ZHU.**(COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)** (KLEIN, ALAN) Modified on 9/18/2019 (tjd).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDERED REQUESTING LEAVE TO SUBMIT A BRIEF REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION IS GRANTED AND NON-PARTY LESLEY ZHU MAY FILE A SHORT REPLY BRIEF TO THE RETROPHIN OPPOSITION BY TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 9/12/19. 9/13/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 9/13/2019 (jaa, ).
September 6, 2019 Filing 84 Response in Opposition re #82 Application/Petition for Attorneys' Fees by RETROPHIN, INC.. (COE, RICHARD)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ESTABLISHING ARTICLE III STANDING AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 20, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 8/27/19. 8/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 8/29/2019 (jaa, ).
August 26, 2019 Filing 82 PETITION FOR REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S AUGUST 7, 2019 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by LESLEY ZHU. *FILED UNDER SEAL. (jaa, ) (tjd, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 81 PLAINTIFF'S SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ESTABLISHING ARTICLE III STANDING AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. *FILED UNDER SEAL. (jaa, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38) (fb, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC OF FILING UNDER SEAL (WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 79 Supplemental BRIEF Establishing Article III Standing and in OPPOSITION re #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Article III Standing filed by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. Certificate of Service. (MATHAS, KURT) Modified on 8/22/2019 (lisad, ).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDERED THAT MOVANT'S MOTION TO QUASH TO SUBPOENA AD TESTIFICANDUM IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 8/7/19. 8/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 8/7/19. 8/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 76 Reply in Support re #74 MOTION for Order to Show Cause CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by RETROPHIN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF PHILIP BOWMAN, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(COE, RICHARD) Modified on 7/22/2019 (tjd).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S LETTER REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE A SHORT REPLY TO NON-PARTY LESLEY ZHU'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY LESLEY ZHU SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT #72 IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT RETROPHIN, INC. SHALL FILE THEIR REPLY NO LATER THAN 7/19/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 7/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Letter) 7/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 74 COPY OF CROSS-MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ZHU SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT FILED BY RETROPHIN, INC. MEMORANDUM. **(FILED PER #71 CA-C ORDER TO TRANSFER)** (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibits, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibits to Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(tjd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 73 COPY OF MOTION TO QUASH THE SUBPOENA AD TESTIFICANDUM AND TO TRANSFER THE MOTION TO QUASH PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 45(F) FILED BY LESLEY ZHU. MEMORANDUM. (FILED PER #71 CA-C TRANSFER ORDER). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Affidavit, #14 Proposed Order, #15 Affidavit)(tjd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 71 COPY OF ORDER SIGNED ON JULY 12, 2019 BY THE HONORABLE JOHN A. KRONSTADT OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA APPROVING THE STIPULATION TO TRANSFER THE MOTION QUASH THE SUBPOENA AND RESPONDENT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AS RELATED TO 18-CV-4553. (tjd) Modified on 7/16/2019 (tjd).
July 15, 2019 Filing 72 NON-PARTY LESLEY SHU'S OPPOSITION TO RETROPHIN, INC.'S CROSS-MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SHE SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(amas) (tjd, ).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #61 ) IS GRANTED AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEAL DEFENDANTS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSTIION OF MS. FLORA HUA AND A PRIVILEGE LOG AND EXHIBITS 1-16 (DOC. NO. #63 ). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 6/24/2019.6/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF MS. FLORA HUA IS DENIED, AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL A PRIVILEGE LOG IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 6/24/2019.6/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER Telephone Conference held on 6/20/19 (jaa, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE rescheduled FOR 6/20/2019 at 2:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER.(sc, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition Filed Under Seal re #62 MOTION to Compel filed by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. Exhibits, Certificate of Service. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd) (tjd, ).
June 13, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/18/2019 at 11:45 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER.(sc, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #62 MOTION to Compel filed by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. (DAHLQUIST, DAVID)
June 6, 2019 Filing 63 DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF MS. FLORA HUA AND A PRIVILEGE LOG AND EXHIBITS WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY, RETROPHIN, INC., MARTIN SHKRELI. *FILED UNDER SEAL*. (jaa, ) Modified on 6/7/2019 (tjd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2019: #1 sealed document, #2 sealed document, #3 sealed document, #4 sealed document, #5 sealed document, #6 sealed document, #7 sealed document, #8 sealed document, #9 sealed document, #10 sealed document, #11 sealed document, #12 sealed document, #13 sealed document, #14 sealed document, #15 sealed document, #16 sealed document) (tjd, ).
June 6, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION to Compel filed by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY, RETROPHIN, INC., MARTIN SHKRELI.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum Filed Under Seal, #3 Certificate of Service)(COE, RICHARD)
June 6, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION to Seal Document filed by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY, RETROPHIN, INC., MARTIN SHKRELI.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COE, RICHARD)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE OF PRIVILEGED INFORMATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 5/23/19. 5/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 59 AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND HARD COPY DOCUMENTS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 5/23/19. 5/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND JEFFREY J. AMATO, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH JOSEPH E. WOLFSON, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 5/22/19. 5/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND MAILED/E-MAILED.(jaa, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 57 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey J. Amato by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13558509.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
May 13, 2019 Filing 56 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER ([Proposed] Stipulated Order Regarding the Disclosure of Privileged Information) by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY.**(COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)** (D'AMBRA, ANDREA) Modified on 5/16/2019 (tjd).
May 1, 2019 Filing 55 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 4/30/19. 5/1/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY (Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Non-Party Vannin Capital LLC) (D'AMBRA, ANDREA)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION ARE STAYED FOR NINETY DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO ALLOW FOR DISCOVERY LIMITED TO THE JURISDICTIONAL ISSUE RAISED ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(1) AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 4/9/19. 4/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 4/9/19. 4/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL BE PERMITTED TO FILE REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS ON OR BEFORE APRIL 15, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/26/19. 3/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 3/28/2019 (jaa, ).
March 15, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Article III Standing filed by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jialue Li, #2 Declaration of David Dahlquist, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Text of Proposed Order)(DAHLQUIST, DAVID)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC SHALL RESPOND TO THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFENDANTS RETROPHIN, INC., MARTIN SHKRELI, PHARMACAL COMPANY, AND ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC. ON OR BEFORE 3/15/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/28/19. 1/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL).(DAHLQUIST, DAVID) Modified on 1/28/2019 (fb).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION OF RICHARD E. COE. ESQUIRE FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF PHILIP M. BOWMAN, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND PHILIP M. BOWMAN, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO THE PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH RICHARD E. COE, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS, RETROPHIN, INC., ET. AL. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/17/19.1/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION OF RICHARD E. COE. ESQUIRE FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DEEPTI BANSAL, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND DEEPTI BANSAL, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO THE PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH RICHARD E. COE, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS, RETROPHIN, INC., ET. AL. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/17/19.1/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND MAILED/EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY re #42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Notice of Joinder in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (D'AMBRA, ANDREA)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION OF RICHARD E. COE, ESQUIRE FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF IAN R. SHAPIRO, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH RICHARD E. COE, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS, RETROPHIN, INC., ET. AL. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/17/19.1/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND MAILED/EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 1/18/2019 (jaa, ).
January 16, 2019 Filing 43 Notice of Joinder to #40 MOTION to Dismiss and #42 Motion to Dismiss filed by MARTIN SHKRELI. Certificate of Service.(BUCKLEY, PETER) Modified on 1/17/2019 (tjd).
January 15, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by RETROPHIN, INC..Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Deepti Bansal in support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O)(COE, RICHARD)
January 15, 2019 Filing 41 Memorandum in Support re #40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Article III Standing filed by MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY and ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC. Memorandum, Brief, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Tom Dooley, #2 Exhibit Trademark License & Supply Agreement, #3 Exhibit Spring Pharmaceuticals, LLC website, #4 Exhibit January 18, 2018 Letter, #5 Exhibit June 22, 2018 Letter)(D'AMBRA, ANDREA) Modified on 1/17/2019 (tjd). Modified on 1/17/2019 (tjd).
January 15, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Spring Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Complaint and Notice of Joinder filed by MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY and ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC. Certificate of Service.(D'AMBRA, ANDREA) Modified on 1/17/2019 (tjd). Modified on 1/17/2019 (tjd).
January 15, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MARTIN SHKRELI.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Peter C. Buckley, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BUCKLEY, PETER)
January 15, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Deepti Bansal ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13286060.) filed by RETROPHIN, INC..Certificate of Service.(COE, RICHARD)
January 14, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Ian R. Shapiro ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13283889.) filed by RETROPHIN, INC..Certificate of Service.(COE, RICHARD)
January 14, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Philip M. Bowman ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13283765.) filed by RETROPHIN, INC..Certificate of Service.(COE, RICHARD)
January 14, 2019 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by RETROPHIN, INC..(COE, RICHARD)
December 13, 2018 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Nationwide Legal re: served Summons & Complaint Packet Affidavit of Return of Service upon Retrophin, Inc. c/o Harvard Business by Special Out State Process on 11/30/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF KURT A. MATHAS ON BEHALF OF SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC IS GRANTED. 12/11/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED.(kp, )
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF DAVID E. DAHLQUIST ON BEHALF OF SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC IS GRANTED. 12/11/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED.(kp, )
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF MICHAEL P. TOOMEY ON BEHALF OF SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC IS GRANTED. 12/11/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED.(kp, )
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF DAN K. WEBB ON BEHALF OF SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC IS GRANTED. 12/11/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED.(kp, ).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF KELLY E. MANNION ON BEHALF OF SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC IS GRANTED. 12/11/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.ECF APPLICATION FORWARDED.(kp, ) (Main Document 29 replaced on 12/11/2018) (kp, ).
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT RETROPHIN, INC. SHALL ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 1/15/2019.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/6/2018. 12/7/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.
December 5, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD E. COE on behalf of RETROPHIN, INC. with Certificate of Service(COE, RICHARD)
December 4, 2018 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kurt A. Mathas by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13208911.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
December 4, 2018 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kelly E. Mannion by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13208888.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
December 4, 2018 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David E. Dahlquist by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13208868.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
December 4, 2018 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Toomey by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13208828.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
December 4, 2018 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dan K. Webb by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13208805.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY ANNE M. RODGERS for ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC.,AND MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/4/2018. 12/4/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.ECF APP FORWARDED.(kp, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN for ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC. AND MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/4/2018. 12/4/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kp, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheriff of Burlington County re: served Summons in a Civil Action, Proof of Servicde, Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief, Exhibit A-C Affidavit of Return of Service upon Martin Sckreli by O/S Personal Service (Self) on 11/7/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY LAYNE E. KRUSE for ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC. AND MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/4/2018. 12/4/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APP FORWARDED. (kp, )
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT MARTIN SHKRELI SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 1/15/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/29/2018. 11/30/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND E-MAILED.(kp, ) Modified on 12/3/2018 (tjd). (Main Document 17 replaced on 12/3/2018) (kp, ).
November 27, 2018 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Mission Pharmacal Company by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC..(D'AMBRA, ANDREA)
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY.(D'AMBRA, ANDREA)
November 27, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Layne E. Kruse by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13192709.). (D'AMBRA, ANDREA)
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anne M. Rodgers by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13192693.). (D'AMBRA, ANDREA)
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robin D. Adelstein by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13192657.). (D'AMBRA, ANDREA)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Layne E. Kruse by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY.**(FILED IN ERROR, INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED, ATTY TO REFILE)**. (D'AMBRA, ANDREA) Modified on 11/27/2018 (tjd).
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anne M. Rodgers by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY..**(FILED IN ERROR, INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED, ATTY TO REFILE)**. (D'AMBRA, ANDREA) Modified on 11/27/2018 (tjd).
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robin D. Adelstein by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY.**(FILED IN ERROR, INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED, ATTY TO REFILE)**. (D'AMBRA, ANDREA) Modified on 11/27/2018 (tjd).
November 21, 2018 1 Summons Issued as to RETROPHIN, INC. Forwarded To: COUNSEL WILL PICK UP on 11/23/18 (jaa, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 Praecipe for Alias Summons for Defendant Retrophin, Inc. by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. (WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' #6 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER IS GRANTED. ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC. AND MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSE NO LATER THAN 1/15/2019.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/19/2018.11/20/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kp, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed Motion of Defendants Mission Pharmacal Company and Alamo Pharma Services, Inc. for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond) filed by ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY.Certificate of Conference and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMBRA, ANDREA)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Nationwide Legal LLC re: served Summons & Complaint Packet Affidavit of Return of Service upon Alamo Pharma Service Inc by Related Entity on 10/31/2018, answer due by 11/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH) Modified on 11/16/2018 (tjd).
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Nationwide Legal LLC re: served Summons & Complaint Packet Affidavit of Return of Service upon Retrophin Inc. c/o The Co Trust Com by Special Out State Process on 10/31/18, answer due 11/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH) Modified on 11/16/2018 (tjd).
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Nationwide Legal LLC re: served Summons & Complaint Packet Affidavit of Return of Service upon Neill Walsdorf - Mission Pharmacal Company by Special Out State Process on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH) Modified on 11/16/2018 (tjd).
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC.(ti, )
October 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY, RETROPHIN, INC., MARTIN SHKRELI. Four Originals Given To: Counsel on 10/23/18 (ti, ) Modified on 10/24/2018 (ti, ).
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC., MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY, RETROPHIN, INC., MARTIN SHKRELI ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 186729.), filed by SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Cover Sheets)(ti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC v. RETROPHIN, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN SHKRELI
Represented By: WILLIAM H. STASSEN
Represented By: PETER C. BUCKLEY
Represented By: PHILIP M. BOWMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RETROPHIN, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD E. COE
Represented By: DEEPTI BANSAL
Represented By: IAN R. SHAPIRO
Represented By: PHILIP M. BOWMAN
Represented By: RANDALL R. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY
Represented By: LAYNE E. KRUSE
Represented By: ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN
Represented By: ANNE M. RODGERS
Represented By: ANDREA L. D'AMBRA
Represented By: PHILIP M. BOWMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAMO PHARMA SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: LAYNE E. KRUSE
Represented By: ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN
Represented By: ANNE M. RODGERS
Represented By: ANDREA L. D'AMBRA
Represented By: PHILIP M. BOWMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPRING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH E. WOLFSON
Represented By: DAN K. WEBB
Represented By: MICHAEL P. TOOMEY
Represented By: KURT A. MATHAS
Represented By: DAVID E. DAHLQUIST
Represented By: KELLY E. MANNION
Represented By: JEFFREY J. AMATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LESLEY ZHU
Represented By: CYNDIE M. CHANG
Represented By: ALAN KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?