NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. GERBER et al
Plaintiff: NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: MEGAN HARGAN and ASHLEY HARGAN GERBER
Case Number: 2:2018cv04563
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) filed by ASHLEY HARGAN GERBER.Certificate of Service.(HERROLD, TYSON)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE #7 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER IS GRANTED. ASHLEY HARGAN GERBER SHALL FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 12/21/2018.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/28/2018.11/29/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) filed by ASHLEY HARGAN GERBER.Certificate of Service.(HERROLD, TYSON)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by TYSON Y. HERROLD on behalf of ASHLEY HARGAN GERBER with Certificate of Service(HERROLD, TYSON)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Funds of Remaining Death Benefit filed by NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certification of Service)(MALYK, JACLYN)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re: Barbara Gordon from Executive Attorney Service, Inc. served Summons and Complaint upon MEGAN HARGAN by Personal. MEGAN HARGAN served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (MALYK, JACLYN)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re: Eric Afflerbach from Executive Attorney Service, Inc. served Summons and Complaint upon ASHLEY HARGAN GERBER by Personal. ASHLEY HARGAN GERBER served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (MALYK, JACLYN)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(jaa, )
October 24, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to ASHLEY HARGAN GERBER, MEGAN HARGAN. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 10/24/18 (jaa, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT against ASHLEY HARGAN GERBER, MEGAN HARGAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE186762.) filed by NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Designation Form, #9 Case Management Track Form)(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. GERBER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGAN HARGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY HARGAN GERBER
Represented By: TYSON Y. HERROLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JACLYN DILASCIO MALYK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?