KING v. UNITED STATES PAROLE COMMISSION

Plaintiff: ROBERT KING
Defendant: UNITED STATES PAROLE COMMISSION
Case Number: 2:2018cv04791
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (pr, )
November 30, 2018 3 Summonses Issued as to UNITED STATES PAROLE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE on 11/30/18 (pr, )
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR WAIVER OF FILING FEES (DOC. NO. 4) IS GRANTED; PETITIONER MAY PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS PURSUANT TO 28 USC, SECTION 1915; THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (DOC. NO. 1) IS DEEMED FILED; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. SERVICE OF THE SUMMONSES AND THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS IS TO BE MADE UPON THE DEFT. BY THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(I).. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/29/18.11/30/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF. AND E-MAILED TO USM.(pr, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION FOR WAIVER OF FILING FEES filed by ROBERT KING.MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 (Application, #2 Inmate Statement)(jaa, ) Modified on 11/23/2018 (jaa, ).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF PETITIONER SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER SUBMIT $400 ($350 FILING FEE AND $50 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR FILE A MOTION TO PRROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH KING WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/7/18. 11/8/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER WITH A BLANK IFP APPLICATION FORM. (pr, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS filed by ROBERT KING.Affidavit. Certificate of Service. Memorandum of Law.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KING v. UNITED STATES PAROLE COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES PAROLE COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?