CAMERON v. YRC, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JOHN CAMERON
Defendant: YRC WORLDWIDE, INC. and YRC, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv05022
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN CAMERON. YRC WORLDWIDE, INC. waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/19/2019; YRC, INC. waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/19/2019. (KARPF, ARI)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by YINAN MA on behalf of JOHN CAMERON (MA, YINAN)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA W. CLARK on behalf of JOHN CAMERON (CLARK, JULIA)
November 20, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JOHN CAMERON. (ahf)
November 20, 2018 Summons Issued as to YRC WORLDWIDE, INC., YRC, INC.. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 11/20/2018 (ahf)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against YRC WORLDWIDE, INC., YRC, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13181534.), filed by JOHN CAMERON.(KARPF, ARI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMERON v. YRC, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC WORLDWIDE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CAMERON
Represented By: ARI RISSON KARPF
Represented By: YINAN MA
Represented By: JULIA W. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?