DIETRICH & ASSOCIATES, INC. v. NEISON et al

Plaintiff: DIETRICH & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Defendant: JOHN R. NEISON, MARK P. UNHOCH and JILL K. NEISON
Case Number: 2:2018cv05034
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ROBERT F KELLY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 6/3/2019; ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 8/14/2019; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 1/11/19. 1/14/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY Pretrial Conference held on 01/11/2019. (nd, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 PRETRIAL PHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/11/2019 AT 8:45 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY.(mr, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by JILL K. NEISON, JOHN R. NEISON, MARK P. UNHOCH.(PAVLICK, MICHAEL)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Pamela J. Jezewski re: served Summons and Complaint upon John R. Neison by personally served Cheryl Neison, his spouse on 11/30/2018 (SHERMAN, TERI)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Bennett Crisp re: served Summons and Complaint upon Jill K. Neison by personal, left with resident boyfriend Roscoe Anderson on 12/03/2018 (SHERMAN, TERI)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sandra Yade re: served Summons and Complaint upon Mark P. Unhoch by Personal on 12/01/2018 (SHERMAN, TERI)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by TERI M. SHERMAN on behalf of DIETRICH & ASSOCIATES, INC. (SHERMAN, TERI)
November 20, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DIETRICH & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (jl, )
November 20, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to JILL K. NEISON, JOHN R. NEISON, MARK P. UNHOCH. Forwarded To: MICHAEL CORAN on 11/21/18 (jl, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JILL K. NEISON, JOHN R. NEISON, MARK P. UNHOCH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE188202.), filed by DIETRICH & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 CASE MANAGEMENT FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIETRICH & ASSOCIATES, INC. v. NEISON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN R. NEISON
Represented By: MICHAEL A. PAVLICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK P. UNHOCH
Represented By: MICHAEL A. PAVLICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL K. NEISON
Represented By: MICHAEL A. PAVLICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIETRICH & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL K. CORAN
Represented By: TERI M. SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?