THOMPSON v. ROBERT GANTER CONTRACTOR'S, INC. et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD THOMPSON
Defendant: ROBERT GANTER CONTRACTOR'S, INC. and RGC SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv05037
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ROBERT GANTER CONTRACTOR'S, INC..(VOLUCK, PHILIP)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RGC SERVICES, INC..(VOLUCK, PHILIP)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by GLEB EPELBAUM on behalf of RGC SERVICES, INC., ROBERT GANTER CONTRACTOR'S, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(EPELBAUM, GLEB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MICHAEL J. REVNESS on behalf of RGC SERVICES, INC., ROBERT GANTER CONTRACTOR'S, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REVNESS, MICHAEL)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP R. VOLUCK on behalf of RGC SERVICES, INC., ROBERT GANTER CONTRACTOR'S, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(VOLUCK, PHILIP)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM C. LEASE on behalf of RICHARD THOMPSON (LEASE, ADAM)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD THOMPSON. RGC SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 11/21/2018, answer due 1/20/2019; ROBERT GANTER CONTRACTOR'S, INC. waiver sent on 11/21/2018, answer due 1/20/2019. (KARPF, ARI)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by GLEB EPELBAUM on behalf of RGC SERVICES, INC., ROBERT GANTER CONTRACTOR'S, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(EPELBAUM, GLEB)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. REVNESS on behalf of RGC SERVICES, INC., ROBERT GANTER CONTRACTOR'S, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REVNESS, MICHAEL)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RGC SERVICES, INC., ROBERT GANTER CONTRACTOR'S, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13184183.), filed by RICHARD THOMPSON.(KARPF, ARI)
November 21, 2018 Summons Issued as to RGC SERVICES, INC., ROBERT GANTER CONTRACTOR'S, INC.. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 11/21/18 (jwl, )
November 21, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RICHARD THOMPSON. (jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMPSON v. ROBERT GANTER CONTRACTOR'S, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD THOMPSON
Represented By: ARI RISSON KARPF
Represented By: ADAM C. LEASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT GANTER CONTRACTOR'S, INC.
Represented By: GLEB EPELBAUM
Represented By: PHILIP R. VOLUCK
Represented By: MICHAEL J. REVNESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RGC SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: GLEB EPELBAUM
Represented By: PHILIP R. VOLUCK
Represented By: MICHAEL J. REVNESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?