IN RE: DEVAL CORPORATION
Debtor In Possession: DEVAL CORPORATION
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Interested Party: PARTS LIFE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv05135
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant's BRIEF by PARTS LIFE, INC.. Appellee Brief due by 2/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(RUBLEY, WILLIAM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Consent of Designation of Record for Cross Appeal. (Attachments: #1 docket)(kw, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Briefing Schedule 12/28/18 Entered and copies e-mailed and mailed. (jwl, ) Modified on 12/28/2018 (jwl, ).
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Original Bankruptcy record together with designation of record on appeal received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(jwl, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PARTS LIFE, INC..(RUBLEY, WILLIAM)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Cross-Appeal from the order of Bankruptcy Judge Ashley M. Chan filed on 11/15/18. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(kw, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of DEVAL CORPORATION from the order of Bankruptcy Judge ASHLEY M. CHAN filed on 11/15/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, Order and Opinion being Appealed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: DEVAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: DEVAL CORPORATION
Represented By: DAVID B. SMITH
Represented By: ROBERT M. GREENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Represented By: KEVIN P. CALLAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PARTS LIFE, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM P. RUBLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?