ANSELMO v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: DENISE ANSELMO
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, CAPTAIN MARK BURGMANN, SERGEANT COLLEEN MICHVECH and JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2018cv05160
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MAY FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 1/31/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/8/19. 1/9/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE S. MORRIS on behalf of MARK BURGMANN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, COLLEEN MICHVECH with Certificate of Service(MORRIS, NICOLE)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DENISE ANSELMO re: Joseph Connelly served Summons and Complaint upon MARK BURGMANN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, COLLEEN MICHVECH by Personal Service. MARK BURGMANN served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019; CITY OF PHILADELPHIA served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019; COLLEEN MICHVECH served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (fdc, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW B. WEISBERG on behalf of DENISE ANSELMO with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
November 29, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DENISE ANSELMO. (ahf)
November 29, 2018 Summons Issued as to MARK BURGMANN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, COLLEEN MICHVECH. 3 Forwarded To: Counsel on 11/30/2018 (ahf)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARK BURGMANN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, COLLEEN MICHVECH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 188609.), filed by DENISE ANSELMO.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANSELMO v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: NICOLE S. MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN MARK BURGMANN
Represented By: NICOLE S. MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT COLLEEN MICHVECH
Represented By: NICOLE S. MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE ANSELMO
Represented By: GARY SCHAFKOPF
Represented By: MATTHEW B. WEISBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?