YUSKO v. NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD.
Plaintiff: JOANN YUSKO
Defendant: NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD.
Case Number: 2:2018cv05257
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11:00 A.M. ON 2/14/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/30/19. 1/30/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Response to PreMotion Conference Request by JOANN YUSKO. (DATNER, ROBERT) Modified on 1/17/2019 (fb).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND WITHIN FIVE BUSINESS DAYS TO DEFENDANT NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD., FILED A LETTER REQUESTING A PRE MOTION CONFERENCE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/11/19. 1/11/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Pre-Motion To Dismiss conference letter by NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD.. (DOLAN, MICHAEL) Modified on 1/3/2019 (fb).
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. DOLAN on behalf of NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD. (DOLAN, MICHAEL)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 12(b) Procedural Order (CJL)
December 5, 2018 1 Summons Issued as to NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 12/6/2018 (amas)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 188961.), filed by JOANN YUSKO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YUSKO v. NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANN YUSKO
Represented By: ROBERT F. DATNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCL (BAHAMAS) LTD.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. DOLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?