Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. v. Lafarge North America Inc.
Plaintiff: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Defendant: Lafarge North America Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv05305
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PARTIES WILL ABIDE BY THE PROPOSED SCHEDULE OUTLINED ABOVE AND WILL ABIDE BY THE STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 2/4/2019. 2/4/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 835 IN 13-MD-2437) (kp, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 20 PROCEDURAL ORDER THAT COUNSEL WILL DISCUSS THE COURT'S COMMENTS DURING THE CONFERENCE CALL AND PREPARE A NEW PRETRIAL SCHEDULE PROVIDING FOR EARLY RESOLUTION OF ANY DISPUTES ABOUT DOCUMENT PRODUCTION OR INTERROGATORIES, AND ALSO PROVIDING FOR A DEADLINE FOR ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND SHALL FILE THIS PROPOSED SCHEDULE NO LATER THAN 2/1/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/16/2019. 1/16/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 830 IN 13-MD-2437)(kp, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/15/2019, before Judge Baylson. (SEE DOCKET NO. 829 IN 13-MD-2437)(kp, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER L. GREENBLATT on behalf of Lafarge North America Inc. with Certificate of Service(GREENBLATT, JENNIFER)
December 27, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/15/2019 03:00 PM (EASTERN) BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THIS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520.(lds, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-02839. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 10, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Case to be transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Joint Motion for Entry of Limited Protective Order. The Protective Order entered in the MDL pending in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania styled In re Domestic Drywall Antitrust Litig., No. 2:13-MD-02437 (E.D. Pa.) on August 5, 2013 and attached to the parties' Joint Motion as Exhibit A is binding on the parties for purposes of the limited production of documents described in the Joint Motion. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/7/2018. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Entry of Limited Protective Order by Lafarge North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fellows, Henry) Modified on 11/7/2018 to edit text (rlb). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay Discovery and Filing of Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan pending the outcome of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigations decision on the appropriate forum for this litigation. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/11/18. (jkl) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay by Lafarge North America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - Opposition to Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit C - Reply in Support of Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fellows, Henry) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Tarek Ismail. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 9/27/18. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
September 27, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Tarek Ismail Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8165984). Attorney Tarek Ismail added appearing on behalf of Lafarge North America Inc. (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Clerks Notation re #10 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Lafarge North America Inc, identifying Corporate Parent Lafarge S.A. Lafarge Holcim Ltd. for Lafarge North America Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lafarge North America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lafarge S.A. LafargeHolcim Ltd. for Lafarge North America Inc.. (Fellows, Henry) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Lafarge North America Inc.. Discovery ends on 6/21/2019.(Fellows, Henry) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Tarek Ismail Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8165984)by Lafarge North America Inc.. (Fellows, Henry) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Baugh on behalf of Lafarge North America Inc. (Baugh, Christina) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry D. Fellows, Jr on behalf of Lafarge North America Inc. (Fellows, Henry) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. All Defendants. (Watson, George) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
June 12, 2018 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Home Depot USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot USA, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Watson, George) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lafarge North America Inc.. (eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-7938090) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/10/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. v. Lafarge North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: George Patrick Watson
Represented By: Sakinah Noelle Jones
Represented By: Lindsay Sklar Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafarge North America Inc.
Represented By: Tarek Ismail
Represented By: Christina M. Baugh
Represented By: Henry D. Fellows, Jr.
Represented By: JENNIFER L. GREENBLATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?