BLANDING v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Plaintiff: KEITH BLANDING
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv05331
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 Amtrak's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(STOLYAR, VICTORIYA)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/5/2019 10:00 AM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 2/5/19. 2/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/5/19. (rf, )
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/5/2019 09:00 AM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 1/30/19. 1/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND TO JOIN OR ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES SHALL BE FILED WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAY OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ALL FACT DISCVOERY SHALL BE COMPLETED NO LATER THAN 5/24/2019. MOTIONS COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE SCHEDULED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 6/7/2019. DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 6/14/2019. NO LATER THAN 7/5/2019, EACH PARTY SHALL FILE WITH TH CLERK OF COURT A PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 7/12/2019. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/30/2019, AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 9614). THIS CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL ON 8/1/2019, AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/29/19. 1/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for a Conference held on 1/29/19 before Judge Savage and all counsel. (mbh, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Discovery Plan by KEITH BLANDING. (OLLEY, MICHAEL)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by VICTORIYA STOLYAR on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (STOLYAR, VICTORIYA)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/29/2019 10:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/7/19. 1/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 2/6/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/7/19. 1/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by YURI J. BRUNETTI on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (BRUNETTI, YURI)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael J. Olley re: served Complaint and Summons upon National Railroad Passenger Corp. by Certified Mail Return Receipt Requested on December 17, 2018 (OLLEY, MICHAEL)
December 10, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KEITH BLANDING. (jl, )
December 10, 2018 1 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. Forwarded To: MICHAEL OLLEY on 12/11/18 (jl, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE189243.), filed by KEITH BLANDING, JURY DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLANDING v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: YURI J. BRUNETTI
Represented By: VICTORIYA STOLYAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH BLANDING
Represented By: MICHAEL J. OLLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?