DAJ MUSHROOMS, LLC v. OAKSHIRE MUSHROOM FARM, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DAJ MUSHROOMS, LLC
Defendant: LAURA SCHROEDER, OAKSHIRE MUSHROOM FARM, INC. and GARY SCHROEDER
Case Number: 2:2018cv05461
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 The sum of $ 100.00 deposited into the Registry of the Court by DAJ MUSHROOMS, LLC. (ti, )
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. FURTHER ORDERED THAT A HEARING SHALL BE HELD NO SOONER THAN 90 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, AT WHICH TIME ARGUMENTS SHALL BE HEARD REGARDING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL POST A BOND IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 FOR THE PAYMENT OF SUCH COSTS AND DAMAGES AS MAY BE INCURRED OR SUFFERED BY ANY PARTY WHO IS FOUND TO HAVE BEEN WRONGFULLY ENJOINED OR RESTRAINED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 12/20/18. 12/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, EMAILED.(rf, )
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT SHOW CAUSE HEARING SET FOR 3/21/2019 02:30 PM. FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL CAUSE A COPY OF THE ORDER ALONG WITH A COPY OF THE COMPLAINT IN THE AFORESAID MOTION AND ACCOMPANYING PAPERS TO BE SERVED UPON DEFENDANTS AT LEAST 3 DAYS BEFORE THE DAY OF THE HEARING. FURTHER ORDERED THAT UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT, DEFENDANTS SHALL ABIDE BY TERMS OF THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THIS COURT ON 12/20/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 12/20/18. 12/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *DEFENDANTS TO BE SERVED BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL PER ORDER.(rf, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Temporary Restraining Order filed by DAJ MUSHROOMS, LLC..(KLEIN, SCOTT) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 12/19/2018 (md).
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by DAJ MUSHROOMS, LLC.(rf, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(rf, )
December 19, 2018 3 Original Summons Issued as to OAKSHIRE MUSHROOM FARM, INC., GARY SCHROEDER, LAURA SCHROEDER forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 12/19/18.(rf, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OAKSHIRE MUSHROOM FARM, INC., GARY SCHROEDER, LAURA SCHROEDER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE189649.), filed by DAJ MUSHROOMS, LLC., EXHIBITS, VERIFICATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAJ MUSHROOMS, LLC v. OAKSHIRE MUSHROOM FARM, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAJ MUSHROOMS, LLC
Represented By: SIGMUND J. FLECK
Represented By: SCOTT M. KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA SCHROEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAKSHIRE MUSHROOM FARM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY SCHROEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?