ROMICH et al v. FIRELY PEDIATRIC SERVICES, INC. et al

Plaintiff: CHRIS ROMICH, JONATHAN ROMICH and EILEEN ROMICH
Defendant: SUSAN BABEL, NANCY THALER, TAMMY LEWIS, MARTY FIRELY, ROCHELLE ZASLOW, FIRELY PEDIATRIC SERVICES, INC., THE PENN FOUNDATION, MONTGOMERY COUNTY OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS, SUSAN SALTMAN, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS, JOANNA MUTH, HOLLY FIRELY and MELISSA BABEL
Case Number: 2:2018cv05494
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ADRIANNA ALFANO CHERKAS on behalf of CHRIS ROMICH, EILEEN ROMICH, JONATHAN ROMICH with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CHERKAS, ADRIANNA)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON WALTER BIALKER on behalf of MELISSA BABEL, THE PENN FOUNDATION with Certificate of Service(BIALKER, JASON)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg for Pre-Motion Conference by MELISSA BABEL, THE PENN FOUNDATION. (BANTON, WILLIAM) Modified on 2/6/2019 (lisad, ).
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MELISSA BABEL, THE PENN FOUNDATION. (BANTON, WILLIAM)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM LANCE BANTON, JR on behalf of MELISSA BABEL, THE PENN FOUNDATION with Certificate of Service(BANTON, WILLIAM)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP W. NEWCOMER on behalf of MONTGOMERY COUNTY OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS, JOANNA MUTH (NEWCOMER, PHILIP)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN A. HUGHES on behalf of MONTGOMERY COUNTY OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS, JOANNA MUTH (HUGHES, LAUREN)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOANNA MUTH, MONTGOMERY COUNTY OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS. JOANNA MUTH waiver sent on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019; MONTGOMERY COUNTY OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS waiver sent on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (HUGHES, LAUREN)
January 4, 2019 Summons Corrected/Reissued as to MELISSA BABEL, HOLLY FIRELY, MARTY FIRELY, FIRELY PEDIATRIC SERVICES, INC., TAMMY LEWIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS, JOANNA MUTH, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS, SUSAN SALTMAN, NANCY THALER, THE PENN FOUNDATION, ROCHELLE ZASLOW. Twelve (12) Originals Forwarded To: Counsel on 01/04/19 (ti, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 12(b) Procedural Order (CJL)
December 20, 2018 Summons Issued as to MELISSA BABEL, HOLLY FIRELY, MARTY FIRELY, FIRELY PEDIATRIC SERVICES, INC., TAMMY LEWIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS, JOANNA MUTH, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS, SUSAN SALTMAN, NANCY THALER, THE PENN FOUNDATION, ROCHELLE ZASLOW. Twelve (12) Originals Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/26/18 (ti, ) Modified on 1/4/2019 (ti, ).
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MELISSA BABEL, HOLLY FIRELY, MARTY FIRELY, FIRELY PEDIATRIC SERVICES, INC., TAMMY LEWIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS, JOANNA MUTH, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS, SUSAN SALTMAN, NANCY THALER, THE PENN FOUNDATION, ROCHELLE ZASLOW ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 189741.), filed by EILEEN ROMICH, JONATHAN ROMICH, CHRIS ROMICH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ti, ) Modified on 1/4/2019 (ti, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROMICH et al v. FIRELY PEDIATRIC SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN BABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY THALER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMMY LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTY FIRELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCHELLE ZASLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRELY PEDIATRIC SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PENN FOUNDATION
Represented By: WILLIAM LANCE BANTON, JR.
Represented By: JASON WALTER BIALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONTGOMERY COUNTY OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS
Represented By: LAUREN A. HUGHES
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN SALTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES OFFICE OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANNA MUTH
Represented By: LAUREN A. HUGHES
Represented By: PHILIP W. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLY FIRELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA BABEL
Represented By: WILLIAM LANCE BANTON, JR.
Represented By: JASON WALTER BIALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS ROMICH
Represented By: MICHAEL D. RAFFAELE
Represented By: ADRIANNA ALFANO CHERKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN ROMICH
Represented By: MICHAEL D. RAFFAELE
Represented By: ADRIANNA ALFANO CHERKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EILEEN ROMICH
Represented By: MICHAEL D. RAFFAELE
Represented By: ADRIANNA ALFANO CHERKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?