OREE v. BERRYHILL

Plaintiff: BRIANA SHARNEE OREE
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv05501
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY R RICE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 Social Security Magistrate Consent by BRIANA SHARNEE OREE.. (GORNSTEIN, SHARON)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE FORM CONSENTING OR DECLINING THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE WITHIN 10 DAYS, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/15/19. (Attachments: #1 CONSENT) 1/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO HUTCHINSON, EMAILED.(rf, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Procedural Order 12/24/18 Entered and copies mailed and e-mailed. (ti, )
December 21, 2018 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, One Original Given to the U.S. Attorney and Two Originals Forwarded To: US Marshals on 12/24/18 (ti, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(i). THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/21/18.12/24/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(jaa, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL filed by BRIANA SHARNEE OREE. IFP PENDING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jaa, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/21/2018) (jaa, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/21/2018) (jaa, ).
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by BRIANA SHARNEE OREE.(jaa, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/21/2018) (jaa, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OREE v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIANA SHARNEE OREE
Represented By: SHARON GORNSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?