PRATER v. AMERICAN HERITAGE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION et al
Plaintiff: CHARMAINE PRATER
Defendant: JANE DOE, MATTHEW JAMES, JOH DOE, VICE PRESIDENT BRIAN HAHN, JOHN DOE, STEPHANIE POMPEY, LYNETTE SMART, THOMAS F. CHAPMAN, PRESIDENT BRUCE FOULKE and AMERICAN HERITAGE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Case Number: 2:2018cv05515
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION TO REINSTATE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (ECF NO. 6) IS GRANTED. PRATER SHALL FILE HER AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 2/28/2019. TO THE EXTENT PRATER REQUESTS OTHER RELIEF, IT IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/22/19. 1/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S. KESSLER on behalf of AMERICAN HERITAGE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, THOMAS F. CHAPMAN, BRUCE FOULKE, BRIAN HAHN, MATTHEW JAMES, JANE DOE(SUPERVISOR OF RED LION CUSTOMER SERVICE CALL CENTER), JANE DOE, JANE DOE(HUNTING PARK LOCATION TELLER/CLERK), JANE DOE(SUPERVISOR OF RED LION CUSTOMER SERVICE ), JOH DOE, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE, STEPHANIE POMPEY with Certificate of Service; Jury Demand(KESSLER, ANDREW)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 CHARMAINE PRATER MOTION TO REINSTATE AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO AMEND DUE TO NON RECEIPT OF ORDERS/MAIL.(jl, )
January 7, 2019 Blank copy of Complaint mailed to pro se plff on 1/8/19. (kw, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. PRATER IS GIVEN LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER IN THE EVENT THAT SHE CAN STATE A PLAUSIBLE CLAIM THAT LIES WIITHIN THIS COURT'S JURISDICTION, ETC. IF PRATER FILES AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/7/19. 1/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/7/19. 1/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
December 21, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHARMAINE PRATER. (ahf)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN HERITAGE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, THOMAS F. CHAPMAN, BRUCE FOULKE, BRIAN HAHN, MATTHEW JAMES, JANE DOE(SUPERVISOR OF RED LION CUSTOMER SERVICE CALL CENTER), JANE DOE, JANE DOE(HUNTING PARK LOCATION TELLER/CLERK), JANE DOE(SUPERVISOR OF RED LION CUSTOMER SERVICE ), JOH DOE, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE, STEPHANIE POMPEY, LYNETTE SMART, filed by CHARMAINE PRATER.(ahf)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY CHARMAINE PRATER.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRATER v. AMERICAN HERITAGE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Represented By: ANDREW S. KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW JAMES
Represented By: ANDREW S. KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOH DOE
Represented By: ANDREW S. KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICE PRESIDENT BRIAN HAHN
Represented By: ANDREW S. KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Represented By: ANDREW S. KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE POMPEY
Represented By: ANDREW S. KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNETTE SMART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS F. CHAPMAN
Represented By: ANDREW S. KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESIDENT BRUCE FOULKE
Represented By: ANDREW S. KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN HERITAGE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Represented By: ANDREW S. KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARMAINE PRATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?