PALICKI et al v. GEICO CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: ROSEMARIE PALICKI, JOHN E. PALICKI and ROSEMARIE C. PALICKI
Defendant: GEICO CORPORATION, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO ADVANTAGE INSURANCE COMPANY and GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00044
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to the Honorable Gerald A. McHugh re settlement by JOHN E. PALICKI, ROSEMARIE C. PALICKI. (ROSENBERG, MARC) Modified on 2/21/2019 (lisad, ).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS, JOHN E. PALICKI AND ROSEMARIE C. PALICKI, (HUSBAND AND WIFE), ARE GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE THEIR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS OF THE FILING OF THIS ORDER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE PLEADING SHALL BE DUE THIRTY (30) DAYS AFTER THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS FILED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 2/6/19. 2/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TWO (2) WEEKS, UNTIL FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 8, 2019, TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/24/19. 1/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Count I, III, IV and all Averments of Bad Faith and Breach of Fiduciary Duty filed by GEICO ADVANTAGE INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO CORPORATION, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY.Brief and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit)(TREDWELL, SCOTT)
January 4, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(ahf)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO ADVANTAGE INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO CORPORATION, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, Certificate of Service, from Court of Common Pleas Phila. County, case number 181200023. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE190377) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PALICKI et al v. GEICO CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEMARIE PALICKI
Represented By: MARC SETH ROSENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN E. PALICKI
Represented By: MARC SETH ROSENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEMARIE C. PALICKI
Represented By: MARC SETH ROSENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO CORPORATION
Represented By: SCOTT J. TREDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: SCOTT J. TREDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: SCOTT J. TREDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: SCOTT J. TREDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO ADVANTAGE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: SCOTT J. TREDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: SCOTT J. TREDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?