GAFFNEY v. KANDRAVI et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. GAFFNEY
Defendant: MICHAEL J. KANDRAVI, THE 401K ROLLOVER STORE, L.L.C. and EXPLORE FINANCIAL GROUP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00061
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT J. GAFFNEY. MICHAEL J. KANDRAVI waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019.(GUILIANO, NICHOLAS) Modified on 1/24/2019 (md).
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 12(b) Procedural Order(CJL)
January 7, 2019 Three (3) Summons Issued as to EXPLORE FINANCIAL GROUP, MICHAEL J. KANDRAVI, THE 401K ROLLOVER STORE, L.L.C.. Forwarded To: Nicholas J. Guiliano, Esq. on 1/7/19. (fdc)
January 7, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROBERT J. GAFFNEY. (fdc, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EXPLORE FINANCIAL GROUP, MICHAEL J. KANDRAVI, THE 401K ROLLOVER STORE, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190448.), filed by ROBERT J. GAFFNEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAFFNEY v. KANDRAVI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. GAFFNEY
Represented By: NICHOLAS J. GUILIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. KANDRAVI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE 401K ROLLOVER STORE, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPLORE FINANCIAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?