BUFFALO GROVE POLICE PENSION FUND v. DIEFENDERFER et al

Plaintiff: BUFFALO GROVE POLICE PENSION FUND
Defendant: JANE J THOMPSON, WILLIAM M DIEFENDERFER, III, SOMSAK CHIVAVIBAL, LAURA S UNGER, JOHN K ADAMS, KATHERINE A LEHMAN, BARRY A MUNITZ, CHRISTIAN M LOWN, ANNA ESCOBEDO CABRAL, JOHN (JACK) F REMONDI, TIMOTHY J HYNES, IV, ANN TORRE BATES, STEVEN L SHAPIRO, LINDA A MILLS, DIANE SUITT GILLELAND, BARRY L WILLIAMS and JOHN M KANE
Nominal Defendant: NAVIENT CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00062
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Referring Judge: LYNNE A SITARSKI
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/11/2019 AT 02:30 PM. ALL PROCEEDINGS IN THE ACTION ARE STAYED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT, EXCEPT AS MAY BE NECESSARY TO IMPLEMENT THE SETTLEMENT OR COMPLY WITH THE TERMS OF THIS ORDER OR THE STIPULATION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/23/19. 1/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/18/19. 1/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI TELEPHONE Pretrial Conference held on 1/16/19. (jl, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by BUFFALO GROVE POLICE PENSION FUND.. (ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/16/19. 1/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND E-MAILED.(va, )
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF GEOFFREY M. JOHNSON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/16/19. 1/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 1/11/19. (va, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Christopher S. Turner ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13283054.) filed by JOHN K ADAMS, ANN TORRE BATES, SOMSAK CHIVAVIBAL, WILLIAM M DIEFENDERFER, III, ANNA ESCOBEDO CABRAL, DIANE SUITT GILLELAND, TIMOTHY J HYNES, IV, JOHN M KANE, KATHERINE A LEHMAN, CHRISTIAN M LOWN, LINDA A MILLS, BARRY A MUNITZ, NAVIENT CORPORATION, JOHN (JACK) F REMONDI, STEVEN L SHAPIRO, JANE J THOMPSON, LAURA S UNGER, BARRY L WILLIAMS.Proposed Order, Applicant's Affidavit, Sponsor's Affidavit, and Certificate of Service.(IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN on behalf of JOHN K ADAMS, ANN TORRE BATES, SOMSAK CHIVAVIBAL, WILLIAM M DIEFENDERFER, III, ANNA ESCOBEDO CABRAL, DIANE SUITT GILLELAND, TIMOTHY J HYNES, IV, JOHN M KANE, KATHERINE A LEHMAN, CHRISTIAN M LOWN, LINDA A MILLS, BARRY A MUNITZ, NAVIENT CORPORATION, JOHN (JACK) F REMONDI, STEVEN L SHAPIRO, JANE J THOMPSON, LAURA S UNGER, BARRY L WILLIAMS with Certificate of Service(IN DEN BERKEN, GREGORY)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT (ECF NO. #2 ) IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI FOR DISPOSITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/8/19. 1/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Geoffrey M. Johnson (Filing fee $ 40.) filed by BUFFALO GROVE POLICE PENSION FUND.Applicant's Affidavit, Sponsor's Affidavit, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service.(ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BUFFALO GROVE POLICE PENSION FUND. JOHN K ADAMS waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; ANN TORRE BATES waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; SOMSAK CHIVAVIBAL waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; WILLIAM M DIEFENDERFER, III waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; ANNA ESCOBEDO CABRAL waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; DIANE SUITT GILLELAND waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; TIMOTHY J HYNES, IV waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; JOHN M KANE waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; KATHERINE A LEHMAN waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; CHRISTIAN M LOWN waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; LINDA A MILLS waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; BARRY A MUNITZ waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; NAVIENT CORPORATION waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; JOHN (JACK) F REMONDI waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; STEVEN L SHAPIRO waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; JANE J THOMPSON waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; LAURA S UNGER waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; BARRY L WILLIAMS waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, DECLARATION OF GEOFFREY M. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, EXHIBIT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration)(rf, )
January 4, 2019 18 Original Summons Issued as to JOHN K ADAMS, ANN TORRE BATES, SOMSAK CHIVAVIBAL, WILLIAM M DIEFENDERFER, III, ANNA ESCOBEDO CABRAL, DIANE SUITT GILLELAND, TIMOTHY J HYNES, IV, JOHN M KANE, KATHERINE A LEHMAN, CHRISTIAN M LOWN, LINDA A MILLS, BARRY A MUNITZ, NAVIENT CORPORATION, JOHN (JACK) F REMONDI, STEVEN L SHAPIRO, JANE J THOMPSON, LAURA S UNGER, BARRY L WILLIAMS forwarded to Plaintiffs Counsel on 1/4/19. (rf, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN K ADAMS, ANN TORRE BATES, SOMSAK CHIVAVIBAL, WILLIAM M DIEFENDERFER, III, ANNA ESCOBEDO CABRAL, DIANE SUITT GILLELAND, TIMOTHY J HYNES, IV, JOHN M KANE, KATHERINE A LEHMAN, CHRISTIAN M LOWN, LINDA A MILLS, BARRY A MUNITZ, NAVIENT CORPORATION, JOHN (JACK) F REMONDI, STEVEN L SHAPIRO, JANE J THOMPSON, LAURA S UNGER, BARRY L WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE190447.) filed by BUFFALO GROVE POLICE PENSION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUFFALO GROVE POLICE PENSION FUND v. DIEFENDERFER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE J THOMPSON
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM M DIEFENDERFER, III
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOMSAK CHIVAVIBAL
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA S UNGER
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN K ADAMS
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE A LEHMAN
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY A MUNITZ
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN M LOWN
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNA ESCOBEDO CABRAL
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN (JACK) F REMONDI
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY J HYNES, IV
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN TORRE BATES
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN L SHAPIRO
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA A MILLS
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE SUITT GILLELAND
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY L WILLIAMS
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN M KANE
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: NAVIENT CORPORATION
Represented By: GREGORY BYRON IN DEN BERKEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUFFALO GROVE POLICE PENSION FUND
Represented By: JONATHAN M. ZIMMERMAN
Represented By: GEOFFREY M. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?