MANLEY et al v. CONCELLI TOYOTA OF SPRINGFIELD et al

Plaintiff: ANGELA BAGLIONE and MICHAEL MANLEY
Defendant: POTAMKIN TOYOTA, INC., POTAMKIN TOYOTA NORTH, INC., CONCELLI TOYOTA OF CONSHOHOCKEN, COPAC, INC., R&A SPRINGFIELD INVESTMENTS, INC., CONCELLI TOYOTA OF SPRINGFIELD, CP SPRINGFIELD, LLC, THE POTAMKIN COMPANIES and CONICELLI TOYOTA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00069
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 Response to Affirmative Defenses by MICHAEL MANLEY. (STRANICK, ROBERT)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 7/17/2019 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(jwl, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CONCELLI TOYOTA OF SPRINGFIELD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DEMARCO, JOSEPH)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by CP SPRINGFIELD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DEMARCO, JOSEPH)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal to dismiss Conicelli Toyota, COPAC, Inc., Conicelli Toyota of Conshohocken, R&A Springfield Investments, Inc., the Potamkin Companies, Potamkin Toyota North, Inc., and Potamkin Toyota and to Amend Caption by CP SPRINGFIELD, LLC. (DEMARCO, JOSEPH) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL* Modified on 2/21/2019 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CP SPRINGFIELD, LLC.(DEMARCO, JOSEPH)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CONCELLI TOYOTA OF SPRINGFIELD.(DEMARCO, JOSEPH)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH M. DEMARCO on behalf of CONCELLI TOYOTA OF SPRINGFIELD, CP SPRINGFIELD, LLC with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DEMARCO, JOSEPH)
January 7, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
January 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to CONCELLI TOYOTA OF CONSHOHOCKEN, CONCELLI TOYOTA OF SPRINGFIELD, CONICELLI TOYOTA, COPAC, INC., CP SPRINGFIELD, LLC, POTAMKIN TOYOTA NORTH, INC., POTAMKIN TOYOTA, INC., R&A SPRINGFIELD INVESTMENTS, INC., THE POTAMKIN COMPANIES. 9 Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/8/19 (jwl, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONCELLI TOYOTA OF CONSHOHOCKEN, CONCELLI TOYOTA OF SPRINGFIELD, CONICELLI TOYOTA, COPAC, INC., CP SPRINGFIELD, LLC, POTAMKIN TOYOTA NORTH, INC., POTAMKIN TOYOTA, INC., R&A SPRINGFIELD INVESTMENTS, INC., THE POTAMKIN COMPANIES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190469.), filed by ANGELA BAGLIONE, MICHAEL MANLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANLEY et al v. CONCELLI TOYOTA OF SPRINGFIELD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POTAMKIN TOYOTA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POTAMKIN TOYOTA NORTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONCELLI TOYOTA OF CONSHOHOCKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPAC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&A SPRINGFIELD INVESTMENTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONCELLI TOYOTA OF SPRINGFIELD
Represented By: JOSEPH M. DEMARCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CP SPRINGFIELD, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH M. DEMARCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE POTAMKIN COMPANIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONICELLI TOYOTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA BAGLIONE
Represented By: ROBERT F. STRANICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MANLEY
Represented By: ROBERT F. STRANICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?