COLON v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: KERWIN COLON
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00160
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 Amtrak's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCGOVERN, LAUREN)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCGOVERN, LAUREN)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT, NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) TO FILE ITS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 3/8/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/11/19. 2/11/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION by KERWIN COLON. (OLLEY, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/13/2019 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by YURI J. BRUNETTI on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (BRUNETTI, YURI)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. MCGOVERN on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (MCGOVERN, LAUREN)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: THAT THE INSTANT MATTER SHALL REMAIN IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/4/2019. 2/4/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP. (sme, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael J. Olley re: served Complaint and Summons on January 17, 2019 upon National Railroad Passenger Corp. by Certified Mail Return Receipt Requested on January 17, 2019 (OLLEY, MICHAEL)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum of Law re #2 Order,, Set Deadlines, by KERWIN COLON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (OLLEY, MICHAEL)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING TEN (10) PAGES FILED ON OR BEFORE 1/22/19 AS TO WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT TRANSFER THIS CASE UNDER 28 USC: 1404, 1406 TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE OR ANOTHER DISTRICT WITH SOME CONNECTION TO THIS DISPUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/15/19. 1/15/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED. COPY MAILED TO UNREP. (fdc)
January 10, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(ahf)
January 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KERWIN COLON. (ahf)
January 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/11/2019 (ahf)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190718.), filed by KERWIN COLON.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLON v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERWIN COLON
Represented By: MICHAEL J. OLLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: YURI J. BRUNETTI
Represented By: LAUREN E. MCGOVERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?