STACKHOUSE v. PIPELINE PLASTICS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS STACKHOUSE
Defendant: PIPELINE PLASTICS, INC. and RICHARD T. MCMAHON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00188
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/26/2019 05:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THOMAS STACKHOUSE. PIPELINE PLASTICS, INC. waiver sent on 1/30/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (GARNER, ADAM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THOMAS STACKHOUSE. RICHARD T. MCMAHON waiver sent on 1/30/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (GARNER, ADAM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by RANDALL C. SCHAUER on behalf of RICHARD T. MCMAHON, PIPELINE PLASTICS, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCHAUER, RANDALL)
January 14, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by THOMAS STACKHOUSE. (ahf)
January 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to RICHARD T. MCMAHON, PIPELINE PLASTICS, INC.. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/15/2019 (ahf)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICHARD T. MCMAHON, PIPELINE PLASTICS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190863.), filed by THOMAS STACKHOUSE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STACKHOUSE v. PIPELINE PLASTICS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIPELINE PLASTICS, INC.
Represented By: RANDALL C. SCHAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD T. MCMAHON
Represented By: RANDALL C. SCHAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS STACKHOUSE
Represented By: ADAM HARRISON GARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?