BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORPORATION et al v. HOSPITALITY SUPPORTIVE SYSTEMS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ADELPHIA DEPTFORD, INC., BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORPORATION and BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORP.
Defendant: AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD, JOSEPH ODONNELL, HOSPITALITY SUPPORTIVE SYSTEMS, LLC, TORUS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, EDWARD SNOW, JOHN/JANE DOES(S) 1-10, AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY COMPANY, SELECTIVE LAW GROUP, LLC, PROGRESS BROKERAGE AGENCY, LLC, SELECTIVE RISK MANAGEMENT, LLC, COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY, ABC ENTITIES 1-10, STAR INDEMNITY AND LIABILITY, JOSEPH O'DONNELL, JOHN W. CONNELLY, JR, CHARLES M. DONNELLY, ANTHONY DIIENNO, TORUS NATIONAL INSURANCE CO. and ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00189
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #9 Amended Complaint,,,, #1 Complaint,,, NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH CERTIFICATE OF MERIT AS TO DEFENDANT CHARLES M. ODONNELL (incorrectly identified as Charles M. Donnelly in the caption) by JOSEPH P. GRIMES on behalf of ADELPHIA DEPTFORD, INC., BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GRIMES, JOSEPH)
March 14, 2019 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #9 Amended Complaint,,,, #1 Complaint,,, NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH CERTIFICATE OF MERIT AS TO DEFENDANT EDWARD SNOW by JOSEPH P. GRIMES on behalf of ADELPHIA DEPTFORD, INC., BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GRIMES, JOSEPH)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-189 UNOPPOSED REQUEST TO ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 3/21/2019 AT 10:00 AM, IN THE TWO CASES DOCKETED AT CIVIL ACTION NO. 16-1133 AND CIVIL ACTION NO. 18-3777 IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE REQUEST IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 3/6/2019. 3/7/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER R. BEDOR on behalf of AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD with Certificate of Service(BEDOR, CHRISTOPHER)
March 5, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD D. GABLE, JR on behalf of AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD with Certificate of Service(GABLE, RICHARD)
March 5, 2019 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD. AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD waiver sent on 3/3/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (BROWN, THOMAS)
March 5, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS S. BROWN on behalf of AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD with Certificate of Service(BROWN, THOMAS)
March 4, 2019 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ADELPHIA DEPTFORD, INC., BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORP.. COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 2/14/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (GRIMES, JOSEPH)
March 4, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Request by ADELPHIA DEPTFORD, INC., BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORP., BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORPORATION For Leave to Attend Settlement Conference in Related Matter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(GRIMES, JOSEPH) Modified on 3/4/2019 (lisad, ).
March 3, 2019 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Wilson P. Pastoriza, Guaranteed Subpoena Service, Inc re: served Summons Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and designation, Magistrate Election Instructions upon AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD by Personal on 01/28/2019 (GRIMES, JOSEPH)
March 3, 2019 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Frank Campbell Guaranteed Service Co re: served Summons, Complaint, CCS upon CHARLES M. O'DONNELL by Personal on 01/23/19 (GRIMES, JOSEPH)
March 1, 2019 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Zurich Insurance Group, Ltd. by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY COMPANY.(SYKEN, MARC)
February 26, 2019 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SELECTIVE RISK MANAGEMENT, LLC.(ZUCKER, MARC)
February 25, 2019 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Argo International Holdings, Ltd. by COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY.(STEWART, WILLIAM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO.. ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO. waiver sent on 2/6/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (HUGHES, PATRICK)
February 22, 2019 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SELECTIVE LAW GROUP, LLC.(ZUCKER, MARC)
February 22, 2019 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SELECTIVE RISK MANAGEMENT, LLC.(ZUCKER, MARC) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE WITH CORRECT .PDF* Modified on 2/25/2019 (lisad, ).
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HOSPITALITY SUPPORTIVE SYSTEMS, LLC.(ZUCKER, MARC)
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC J. ZUCKER on behalf of SELECTIVE LAW GROUP, LLC with Certificate of Service(ZUCKER, MARC)
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC J. ZUCKER on behalf of EDWARD SNOW with Certificate of Service(ZUCKER, MARC)
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC J. ZUCKER on behalf of SELECTIVE RISK MANAGEMENT, LLC with Certificate of Service(ZUCKER, MARC)
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC J. ZUCKER on behalf of HOSPITALITY SUPPORTIVE SYSTEMS, LLC with Certificate of Service(ZUCKER, MARC)
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SELECTIVE RISK MANAGEMENT, LLC. (ZUCKER, MARC)
February 21, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EDWARD SNOW. (ZUCKER, MARC)
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SELECTIVE LAW GROUP, LLC. (ZUCKER, MARC)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HOSPITALITY SUPPORTIVE SYSTEMS, LLC. (ZUCKER, MARC)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Enstar Group Limited with Certificate of Service by TORUS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SMITH, MICHAEL)
February 20, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TORUS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. TORUS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 2/13/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (SMITH, MICHAEL)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN PETRILLA on behalf of TORUS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(PETRILLA, BRYAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. SMITH on behalf of TORUS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(SMITH, MICHAEL)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM F. STEWART on behalf of COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(STEWART, WILLIAM)
February 15, 2019 12 Summons Issued as to AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD, ASPEN SPECIALTY INS. CO., JOHN W. CONNELLY, JR, ANTHONY DIIENNO, CHARLES M. DONNELLY, HOSPITALITY SUPPORTIVE SYSTEMS, LLC, PROGRESS BROKERAGE AGENCY, LLC, SELECTIVE LAW GROUP, LLC, SELECTIVE RISK MANAGEMENT, LLC, EDWARD SNOW, STAR INDEMNITY AND LIABILITY, TORUS NATIONAL INSURANCE CO.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 2/19/2019 (sg, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC ENTITIES 1-10, AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY COMPANY, AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD, ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO., COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY, HOSPITALITY SUPPORTIVE SYSTEMS, LLC, JOHN/JANE DOES(S) 1-10, PROGRESS BROKERAGE AGENCY, LLC, SELECTIVE LAW GROUP, LLC, SELECTIVE RISK MANAGEMENT, LLC, EDWARD SNOW, TORUS NATIONAL INS. CO., JOHN W. CONNELLY, JR, CHARLES M. DONNELLY, ANTHONY DIIENNO, STAR INDEMNITY AND LIABILITY, filed by ADELPHIA DEPTFORD, INC., BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORPORATION.EXHIBITS. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT 1, #2 EXHIBIT 2, #3 EXHIBIT 3, #4 EXHIBIT 4, #5 EXHIBIT 5, #6 EXHIBIT 6, #7 EXHIBIT 7, #8 EXHIBIT 8, #9 EXHIBIT 9, #10 EXHIBIT 10, #11 EXHIBIT 11, #12 EXHIBIT 12, #13 EXHIBIT 13, #14 EXHIBIT 14, #15 EXHIBIT 15, #16 EXHIBIT 16, #17 EXHIBIT 17, #18 EXHIBIT 18, #19 EXHIBIT 19, #20 EXHIBIT 20, #21 EXHIBIT 21, #22 EXHIBIT 22, #23 EXHIBIT 23, #24 EXHIBIT 24, #25 EXHIBIT 25, #26 EXHIBIT 26)(sg, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Rich Zechiel, Guaranteed Subpoena Service re: served Summons, Complaint, CCS on behalf of Plaintiffs, Balis Family Restaurant Corp and Adelphia Deptford, Inc, upon ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY by Personal on 02/06/2019 (GRIMES, JOSEPH) Modified on 2/19/2019 (lisad, ).
February 10, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Christy Lynn, Guaranteed Subpoena Service re: served Summons, Complaint, CCS on behalf of Plaintiffs, Balis Family Restaurant Corp and Adelphia Deptford, Inc, upon COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY by personal on 01/25/2019 (GRIMES, JOSEPH) Modified on 2/11/2019 (lisad, ).
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ADELPHIA DEPTFORD, INC.. AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY COMPANY waiver sent on 2/6/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (GRIMES, JOSEPH)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LOUIS A. BOVE on behalf of AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY COMPANY with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BOVE, LOUIS)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC J. SYKEN on behalf of AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY COMPANY with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SYKEN, MARC)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael Marra re: served Complaint ON STARSTONE INSURANCE COMPANY upon Denise Aldridge by personal on 01/23/19 (GRIMES, JOSEPH)
January 17, 2019 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ADELPHIA DEPTFORD, INC., BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORPORATION. *FOR PDF SEE DOC. #2 * (lisad, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by ADELPHIA DEPTFORD, INC., BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORPORATION RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (GRIMES, JOSEPH)
January 14, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
January 14, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ADELPHIA DEPTFORD, INC., BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORPORATION. (jwl, )
January 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY COMPANY, AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD, ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY, HOSPITALITY SUPPORTIVE SYSTEMS, LLC, JOSEPH O'DONNELL, PROGRESS BROKERAGE AGENCY, LLC, SELECTIVE LAW GROUP, LLC, SELECTIVE RISK MANAGEMENT, LLC, EDWARD SNOW, TORUS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. 11 Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/14/19 (jwl, ) Modified on 1/15/2019 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC ENTITIES 1-10, AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY COMPANY, AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD, ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY, HOSPITALITY SUPPORTIVE SYSTEMS, LLC, JOHN/JANE DOES(S) 1-10, JOSEPH O'DONNELL, PROGRESS BROKERAGE AGENCY, LLC, SELECTIVE LAW GROUP, LLC, SELECTIVE RISK MANAGEMENT, LLC, EDWARD SNOW, TORUS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190871.), filed by ADELPHIA DEPTFORD, INC., BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(jwl, ) Modified on 1/15/2019 (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORPORATION et al v. HOSPITALITY SUPPORTIVE SYSTEMS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD
Represented By: THOMAS S. BROWN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. BEDOR
Represented By: RICHARD D. GABLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH ODONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPITALITY SUPPORTIVE SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: MARC J. ZUCKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORUS NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL J. SMITH
Represented By: BRYAN PETRILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD SNOW
Represented By: MARC J. ZUCKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES(S) 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY COMPANY
Represented By: MARC J. SYKEN
Represented By: LOUIS A. BOVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTIVE LAW GROUP, LLC
Represented By: MARC J. ZUCKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESS BROKERAGE AGENCY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTIVE RISK MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: MARC J. ZUCKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: WILLIAM F. STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC ENTITIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAR INDEMNITY AND LIABILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH O'DONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN W. CONNELLY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES M. DONNELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY DIIENNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORUS NATIONAL INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. SMITH
Represented By: BRYAN PETRILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: PATRICK J. HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADELPHIA DEPTFORD, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH P. GRIMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH P. GRIMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BALIS FAMILY RESTAURANT CORP.
Represented By: JOSEPH P. GRIMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?