TUCKER v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: LEORA M TUCKER
Defendant: FIVE JOHN DOES, FIVE JANE DOES, PMA COMPANIES, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, COMPSERVICES, INC. and CITY OF PHILADELPHIA PENSION BOARD
Case Number: 2:2019cv00271
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Vacate Default filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA PENSION BOARD.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order 1, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A)(NAPLES, BETHANN)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BETHANN R. NAPLES on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA PENSION BOARD (NAPLES, BETHANN)
March 5, 2019 Default Entered. (fdc)
March 5, 2019 DEFAULT BY CITY OF PHILADELPHIA PENSION BOARD, COMPSERVICES, INC. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (fdc) Modified on 3/8/2019 (nd, ).
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Default Notice to the Clerk under Rule 55 LEORA M TUCKER against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA PENSION BOARD, COMPSERVICES, INC.. (PURICELLI, BRIAN)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PMA COMPANIES. (VOSS, JOSHUA)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LEORA M TUCKER. (PURICELLI, BRIAN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PMA DOC 2 filed by LEORA M TUCKER. (PURICELLI, BRIAN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Certificate of Service)(NAPLES, BETHANN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE RETURNS & PROOFS by Brian Puricelli Re: accepted summons and complaint for All Defendants. (PURICELLI, BRIAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by BETHANN R. NAPLES on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (NAPLES, BETHANN)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Old Republic General Insurance Group, Inc. by PMA COMPANIES.(VOSS, JOSHUA)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PMA COMPANIES.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(VOSS, JOSHUA)
January 18, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LEORA M TUCKER. (rf, )
January 18, 2019 4 Original Summons Issued as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA PENSION BOARD, COMPSERVICES, INC., PMA COMPANIES, INC forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 1/18/19. (rf, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA PENSION BOARD, COMPSERVICES, INC., FIVE JANE DOES, FIVE JOHN DOES, PMA COMPANIES. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE191129.), filed by LEORA M TUCKER., JURY TRIAL DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rf, ) Modified on 1/23/2019 (md).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TUCKER v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIVE JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIVE JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMA COMPANIES
Represented By: JOSHUA VOSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: BETHANN R. NAPLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPSERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA PENSION BOARD
Represented By: BETHANN R. NAPLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEORA M TUCKER
Represented By: BRIAN M. PURICELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?