CHEN v. UNIVERSITY OF THE SCIENCES IN PHILADELPHIA

Plaintiff: VIVIAN CHEN
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF THE SCIENCES IN PHILADELPHIA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00412
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Certificate of Service filed by UNIVERSITY OF THE SCIENCES IN PHILADELPHIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 2)(GREENSPAN, LESLIE)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (nd, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by VIVIAN CHEN. (BERNEY, DAVID)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Subject Matter Jurisdiction re #9 Order, by UNIVERSITY OF THE SCIENCES IN PHILADELPHIA. (GREENSPAN, LESLIE)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support of Subject Matter Jurisdiction re #9 Order, by UNIVERSITY OF THE SCIENCES IN PHILADELPHIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4) (GREENSPAN, LESLIE)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by VIVIAN CHEN.Certificate of Service.(BERNEY, DAVID)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOE H. TUCKER, JR on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF THE SCIENCES IN PHILADELPHIA with Certificate of Service(TUCKER, JOE)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 1-4), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL EACH FILE A MEMORANDUM NO LATER THAN NOON ON MARCH 6, 2019, ADDRESSING WHETHER I HAVE SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/27/2019. 2/27/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by UNIVERSITY OF THE SCIENCES IN PHILADELPHIA. (GREENSPAN, LESLIE)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED FOR 5/3/2019 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND.(rt)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Letter re Continuance to reschedule conference dated April 16, 2019 by UNIVERSITY OF THE SCIENCES IN PHILADELPHIA. (GREENSPAN, LESLIE) Modified on 2/7/2019 (md).
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/12/2019 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND.(rt)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 Amended ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by UNIVERSITY OF THE SCIENCES IN PHILADELPHIA.(GREENSPAN, LESLIE)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by UNIVERSITY OF THE SCIENCES IN PHILADELPHIA.(GREENSPAN, LESLIE)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/1/2019. 2/1/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
January 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by UNIVERSITY OF THE SCIENCES IN PHILADELPHIA from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number Jan Term, 2019 No. 105. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE191658) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Destination Form, #3 Case Management Track, #4 Ex 1, #5 Ex 2, #6 Ex 3 - 1, #7 Ex 3 - 2, #8 Ex 3 - 3, #9 Ex 4, #10 Ex 5, #11 Ex 6, #12 Ex 7)(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHEN v. UNIVERSITY OF THE SCIENCES IN PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIVIAN CHEN
Represented By: DAVID J. BERNEY
Represented By: JENNIFER Y. SANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF THE SCIENCES IN PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: LESLIE MILLER GREENSPAN
Represented By: JOE H. TUCKER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?