MARMONTELLO et al v. AMERICAN BILTRITE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JOAN MARMONTELLO and CHARLES MARMONTELLO
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, MAGID GLOVE AND SAFETY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, LLC, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, HEDMAN RESOURCES LIMITED, ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC LLC, UNIROYAL, INC., MAREMONT CORPORATION, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA INC., VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, DURO DYNE CORPORATION, VELLUMOID, INC., RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY, 3M COMPANY, AMERICAN BILTRITE, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, HERCULES, LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY, BUFFALO AIR HANDLING, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, CHICAGO-WILCOX MANUFACTURING COMPANY, BWDAC, INC., ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC., GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), LLC, SPIRAX SARCO INC., ECODYNE CORPORATION, YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, SPENCE ENGINEERING COMPANY INC., FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLOWSERVE U.S., INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, JOHN CRANE, INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, TRANE US, INC., KROGH PUMP COMPANY, INC., SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., VIAD CORPORATION, CROWN CORK & SEAL USA, INC., PNEUMO ABEX LLC, CLEAVER-BROOKS, THE GORMAN RUPP COMPANY, CRANE COMPANY, HEXION, INC, ARVINMERITOR, INC., BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., DAP PRODUCTS INC., KAISER-GYPSUM COMPANY, INC., WARREN PUMPS, LLC, DANA COMPANIES, LLC, AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION, THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, CBS CORPORATION, STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC, MCMASTER-CARR SUPPLY COMPANY, FLUOR CORPORATION and IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00462
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 73 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
March 19, 2019 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY, Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(BRUCH, G.) Modified on 3/20/2019 (md).
March 19, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
March 19, 2019 Filing 70 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC.(BRUCH, G.)
March 19, 2019 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC, Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(BRUCH, G.) Modified on 3/20/2019 (md).
March 19, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
March 19, 2019 Filing 67 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
March 19, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE COMPANY with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
March 19, 2019 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CRANE COMPANY, Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(BRUCH, G.) Modified on 3/20/2019 (md).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR REMAND (ECF NO. #20 ) IS GRANTED AND THE CASE IS REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED THAT: (1) THE PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS (ECF NOS. #10 & #26 ) ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE: AND (2) THE CASE ASSOCIATED WITH THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER SHALL BE MARKED AS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/18/19. 3/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, )
March 18, 2019 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by FLOWSERVE U.S., INC.(SEE PAPER #63 FOR PDF)(md)
March 18, 2019 Filing 63 Disclosure with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FLOWSERVE U.S., INC..(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
March 18, 2019 Filing 62 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE GORMAN RUPP COMPANY.(MULLANEY, THERESA)
March 18, 2019 Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by THE GORMAN RUPP COMPANY, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(MULLANEY, THERESA) Modified on 3/18/2019 (md).
March 11, 2019 Filing 60 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (va, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 59 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ARVINMERITOR, INC..(VALINIS, SUSAN)
March 8, 2019 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ARVINMERITOR, INC., Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(VALINIS, SUSAN) Modified on 3/12/2019 (md).
March 7, 2019 Filing 57 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Hexion Holdings LLC by HEXION, INC.(DINO, DAVID)
March 7, 2019 Filing 56 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN)
March 6, 2019 Filing 55 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(SANTORO, CHRISTOPHER) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY RE-FILED AS #56 USING THE CORRECT ATTY LOGIN)Modified on 3/7/2019 (nd, ).
March 6, 2019 Filing 54 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Cert of Service by WARREN PUMPS, LLC.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
March 6, 2019 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WARREN PUMPS, LLC, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(RAU, TIMOTHY) Modified on 3/6/2019 (md).
March 6, 2019 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(RAU, TIMOTHY) Modified on 3/6/2019 (md).
March 6, 2019 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GARDNER DENVER, INC., Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN) Modified on 3/6/2019 (md).
March 6, 2019 Filing 50 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC.(RYAN, DANIEL)
March 6, 2019 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(RYAN, DANIEL) Modified on 3/6/2019 (md).
March 5, 2019 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ECODYNE CORPORATION, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY) Modified on 3/6/2019 (md).
March 4, 2019 Filing 47 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Cleaver-Holdings, Inc. with Certificate of Service by CLEAVER-BROOKS.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
March 4, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CLEAVER-BROOKS, Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(VALINIS, SUSAN) Modified on 3/4/2019 (md).
March 1, 2019 Filing 45 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(RAU, TIMOTHY)
March 1, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID JUSTIN DINO on behalf of HEXION, INC with Certificate of Service(DINO, DAVID)
February 27, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by THERESA M. MULLANEY on behalf of THE GORMAN RUPP COMPANY (MULLANEY, THERESA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 42 Disclosure with Certification of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(SINGER, STEWART)
February 27, 2019 Filing 41 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certification of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(SINGER, STEWART)
February 27, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, Defenses, Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(SINGER, STEWART) Modified on 2/27/2019 (md).
February 27, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by STEWART R. SINGER on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certification of Service(SINGER, STEWART)
February 25, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CBS CORPORATION, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(MCSHEA, JOHN) Modified on 2/26/2019 (md).
February 25, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state claim filed by CHARLES MARMONTELLO, JOAN MARMONTELLO. (HODRINSKY, JASON)
February 25, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTIAN A WEIMANN on behalf of ECODYNE CORPORATION (WEIMANN, CHRISTIAN)
February 25, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of ECODYNE CORPORATION (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
February 22, 2019 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and IMO Holdings, Inc. by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
February 21, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES P. HADDEN on behalf of AURORA PUMP COMPANY with Certificate of Service(HADDEN, JAMES)
February 19, 2019 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC..(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM R. ADAMS on behalf of ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. with JURY DEMAND(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER on behalf of GARDNER DENVER, INC. (SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN)
February 19, 2019 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA INC..(ARRIAGA, ALBA)
February 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by ALBA E. ARRIAGA on behalf of HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA INC. with Certificate of Service(ARRIAGA, ALBA)
February 19, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC LLC.Memorandum Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(SEELAUS, A.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. CORCORAN on behalf of MCMASTER-CARR SUPPLY COMPANY (CORCORAN, BRIAN)
February 14, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of ARVINMERITOR, INC. (VALINIS, SUSAN)
February 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION (VALINIS, SUSAN)
February 14, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by LEAH A. LEWIS on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS (LEWIS, LEAH)
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS (VALINIS, SUSAN)
February 14, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CHARLES MARMONTELLO, JOAN MARMONTELLO.Brief in Support of Motion to Remand and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(HODRINSKY, JASON)
February 11, 2019 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
February 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE)
February 11, 2019 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PNEUMO ABEX LLC.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of PNEUMO ABEX LLC with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE)
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. MCSHEA on behalf of CBS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(MCSHEA, JOHN)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by VELLUMOID, INC..(MAHER, DANIEL)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. MAHER, JR on behalf of VELLUMOID, INC. (MAHER, DANIEL)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Johnson Controls International with Certificate of Service by YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION.(LUXTON, STEVEN)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D)(LOTMAN, ALYSON)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE M. PITT on behalf of FLOWSERVE U.S., INC. (PITT, TERENCE)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL on behalf of FLOWSERVE U.S., INC. with Certificate of Service(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Johnson Controls International with Certificate of Service by YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION.(LUXTON, STEVEN) (INCORRECT PDF; ATTY HAS REFILED AT PAPER #11) Modified on 2/7/2019 (md). Modified on 2/8/2019 (md).
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. LUXTON on behalf of YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(LUXTON, STEVEN)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT with Certificate of Service by GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), LLC.(LUXTON, STEVEN)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. LUXTON on behalf of GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), LLC with Certificate of Service(LUXTON, STEVEN)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC.(REBER, W.)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VIAD CORPORATION from Court of Common Pleas, Philadelphia County, Civil Division, December Term 2018, No. 3262, together with Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 191812)(ti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARMONTELLO et al v. AMERICAN BILTRITE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.
Represented By: CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEWART R. SINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGID GLOVE AND SAFETY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEDMAN RESOURCES LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC LLC
Represented By: A. KAI SEELAUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMONT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: ALYSON WALKER LOTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA INC.
Represented By: ALBA E. ARRIAGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURO DYNE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELLUMOID, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL J. MAHER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN BILTRITE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERCULES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES P. HADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO AIR HANDLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHICAGO-WILCOX MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWDAC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), LLC
Represented By: STEVEN A. LUXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECODYNE CORPORATION
Represented By: CHRISTIAN A WEIMANN
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: STEVEN A. LUXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPENCE ENGINEERING COMPANY INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM R. ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE U.S., INC.
Represented By: BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL
Represented By: TERENCE M. PITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANE US, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KROGH PUMP COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORPORATION
Represented By: KEVIN J O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN CORK & SEAL USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Represented By: LEAH A. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GORMAN RUPP COMPANY
Represented By: THERESA M. MULLANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEXION, INC
Represented By: DAVID JUSTIN DINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARVINMERITOR, INC.
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP PRODUCTS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER-GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA COMPANIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCMASTER-CARR SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: BRIAN P. CORCORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN MARMONTELLO
Represented By: JASON MICHAEL HODRINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES MARMONTELLO
Represented By: JASON MICHAEL HODRINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?