FADID et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Plaintiff: RACHID FADID and AICHA YASSINE
Defendant: JENNIFER RASAMIMANANA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and MICHAEL R. POMPEO
Case Number: 2:2019cv00620
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT RESPONDENTS SHALL ANSWER PETITIONER'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 4/29/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/27/19. 3/27/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS NO LATER THAN THRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/26/19. 2/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd )
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (fdc, )
February 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL R. POMPEO, JENNIFER RASAMIMANANA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. 4 Forwarded To: Counsel & 1 to AUSA on 2/13/2019 (ahf)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL R. POMPEO, JENNIFER RASAMIMANANA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 192455.), filed by RACHID FADID, AICHA YASSINE.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FADID et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHID FADID
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AICHA YASSINE
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER RASAMIMANANA
Represented By: DAVID ANDREW DEGNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: DAVID ANDREW DEGNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R. POMPEO
Represented By: DAVID ANDREW DEGNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?