MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD. et al v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. et al
Plaintiff: THE "EGGED" MEMBERS PENSION FUND LTD., KEREN HGIMLAOT HMERKAZIT HISTADRUT CENTRAL PENSION FUND LTD., THE HADASSAH WORKERS PENSION FUND LTD., MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD. and KERREN MAKEFET PENSION AND PROVIDENT CENTER COOPERATIVE SOCIETY LTD.
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, YAACOV ALTMAN, EYAL DESHEH, YITZHAK PETERBURG, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EREZ VIGODMAN, KARE SCHULTZ and ALLAN OBERMAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv00674
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Original record transferred to the District of Connecticut via interdistrict transfer system. (lisad, )
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' STIPULATION #22 IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT, AND SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 4/4/19. 4/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Transfer and [Proposed] Order by YAACOV ALTMAN, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, YITZHAK PETERBURG, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., EREZ VIGODMAN. (SONNENFELD, MARC)
April 1, 2019 Filing 21 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN, ESQ. (DOC. NO. #4 ); MICHAEL J. WERNKE, ESQ. (DOC. NO. #5 ), AND JORDAN D. HERSHMAN, ESQ. (DOC. NO. #7 ) ARE GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 4/1/2019. 4/1/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.. YITZHAK PETERBURG waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.. YAACOV ALTMAN waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.. TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.. SIGURDUR OLAFSSON waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.. MICHAEL MCCLELLAN waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.. MAUREEN CAVANAUGH waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.. KARE SCHULTZ waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.. EYAL DESHEH waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.. EREZ VIGODMAN waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.. DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.. DEBORAH GRIFFIN waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.. ALLAN OBERMAN waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jordan D. Hershman, Esq. by YAACOV ALTMAN, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, YITZHAK PETERBURG, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., EREZ VIGODMAN. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13434720.). (SONNENFELD, MARC)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC J. SONNENFELD on behalf of YAACOV ALTMAN, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, YITZHAK PETERBURG, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., EREZ VIGODMAN with Certificate of Service(SONNENFELD, MARC)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Wernke by KEREN HGIMLAOT HMERKAZIT HISTADRUT CENTRAL PENSION FUND LTD., KERREN MAKEFET PENSION AND PROVIDENT CENTER COOPERATIVE SOCIETY LTD., MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD., THE "EGGED" MEMBERS PENSION FUND LTD., THE HADASSAH WORKERS PENSION FUND LTD.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13371370.). (KASKELA, DAVID)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy A. Lieberman by KEREN HGIMLAOT HMERKAZIT HISTADRUT CENTRAL PENSION FUND LTD., KERREN MAKEFET PENSION AND PROVIDENT CENTER COOPERATIVE SOCIETY LTD., MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD., THE "EGGED" MEMBERS PENSION FUND LTD., THE HADASSAH WORKERS PENSION FUND LTD.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13371348.). (KASKELA, DAVID)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS MATTER IN SUSPENSE PENDING DEFENDANTS FILING A MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/19/2019. 2/19/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
February 19, 2019 Thirteen Summonses Issued as to YAACOV ALTMAN, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, YITZHAK PETERBURG, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., EREZ VIGODMAN. Forwarded To: D. SEAMUS KASKELA, ESQ. on 2/19/2019 (dmc, ) Modified on 2/21/2019 (lisad, ).
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by KEREN HGIMLAOT HMERKAZIT HISTADRUT CENTRAL PENSION FUND LTD., KERREN MAKEFET PENSION AND PROVIDENT CENTER COOPERATIVE SOCIETY LTD., MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIALINSURANCE FUND LTD., THE "EGGED" MEMBERS PENSION FUND LTD., THE HADASSAH WORKERS PENSION FUND LTD..(dmc, )
February 15, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KEREN HGIMLAOT HMERKAZIT HISTADRUT CENTRAL PENSION FUND LTD., KERREN MAKEFET PENSION AND PROVIDENT CENTER COOPERATIVE SOCIETY LTD., MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIALINSURANCE FUND LTD., THE "EGGED" MEMBERS PENSION FUND LTD., THE HADASSAH WORKERS PENSION FUND LTD.. (dmc, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against YAACOV ALTMAN, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, YITZHAK PETERBURG, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., EREZ VIGODMAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE192567.), filed by THE HADASSAH WORKERS PENSION FUND LTD., MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIALINSURANCE FUND LTD., KEREN HGIMLAOT HMERKAZIT HISTADRUT CENTRAL PENSION FUND LTD., THE "EGGED" MEMBERS PENSION FUND LTD., KERREN MAKEFET PENSION AND PROVIDENT CENTER COOPERATIVE SOCIETY LTD.. (Attachments: #1 COVER SHEETS)(dmc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD. et al v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIGURDUR OLAFSSON
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL MCCLELLAN
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH GRIFFIN
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YAACOV ALTMAN
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EYAL DESHEH
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YITZHAK PETERBURG
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAUREEN CAVANAUGH
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EREZ VIGODMAN
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARE SCHULTZ
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLAN OBERMAN
Represented By: MARC J. SONNENFELD
Represented By: JORDAN D. HERSHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE "EGGED" MEMBERS PENSION FUND LTD.
Represented By: DAVID SEAMUS KASKELA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. WERNKE
Represented By: JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEREN HGIMLAOT HMERKAZIT HISTADRUT CENTRAL PENSION FUND LTD.
Represented By: DAVID SEAMUS KASKELA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. WERNKE
Represented By: JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE HADASSAH WORKERS PENSION FUND LTD.
Represented By: DAVID SEAMUS KASKELA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. WERNKE
Represented By: JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIVTACHIM THE WORKERS SOCIAL INSURANCE FUND LTD.
Represented By: DAVID SEAMUS KASKELA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. WERNKE
Represented By: JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERREN MAKEFET PENSION AND PROVIDENT CENTER COOPERATIVE SOCIETY LTD.
Represented By: DAVID SEAMUS KASKELA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. WERNKE
Represented By: JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?