STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE

Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 2:2019cv00814
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE IS HEREBY SCHEDULED FOR 4/30/19 AT 10:30 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 4/25/19. 4/25/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 108.36.163.84'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA AND THE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/24/19.4/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND TO JOIN OR ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES SHALL BE FILED WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE SCHEDULED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART; FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/22/2019 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/16/2019. MOTIONS DUE BY 9/6/2019. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 10/4/2019. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 8/30/2019. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 9/27/2019. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 9/27/2019. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 10/24/2019 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/24/19. 4/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BONEKEMPER, ANDREW) Modified on 4/18/2019 (lisad, ).
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.(BONEKEMPER, ANDREW) Modified on 4/18/2019 (lisad, ).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 4/24/2019, AT 9:00 AM IN ROOM 9614, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/11/19. 4/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA #6 NO LATER THAN 4/17/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/11/19. 4/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN I. BAER on behalf of JOHN DOE with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service for Entry of Appearance of SIB)(BAER, STEPHEN)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by JOHN DOE.Memorandum, Exhibit, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Quash, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Quash, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service for Motion to Quash and Memo of Law in Support Thereof)(BAER, STEPHEN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM CHRISTIAN MOFFITT on behalf of STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (MOFFITT, WILLIAM)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including General Media Systems, LLC by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.(BONEKEMPER, ANDREW)
February 25, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (ahf)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13372767.), filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form)(BONEKEMPER, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Represented By: STEPHEN I. BAER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: ANDREW W. BONEKEMPER
Represented By: WILLIAM CHRISTIAN MOFFITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?