BROWN et al v. BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF ROSE TREE MEDIA SCHOOL DISTRICT et al

Plaintiff: KIRSTIN BROWN and DAVID BROWN
Defendant: ROSE TREE MEDIA SCHOOL DISTRICT, ALISA HERMAN-LIU, JANE DOE (1), PENNCREST HIGH SCHOOL, J.H., C.M., A.H., STEVEN SILVA, JOHN DOE (2), JOHN DOE (1) and BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF ROSE TREE MEDIA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Case Number: 2:2019cv00836
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Service Deadline Extension and/or Alternative Service and/or conduct discovery and/or leave to file amended complaint filed by DAVID BROWN, KIRSTIN BROWN.Memorandum, Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(CORCORAN, J.)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KIRSTIN BROWN, DAVID BROWN. ALISA HERMAN-LIU waiver sent on 3/20/2019, answer due 5/20/2019; ROSE TREE MEDIA SCHOOL DISTRICT waiver sent on 3/20/2019, answer due 5/20/2019; STEVEN SILVA waiver sent on 3/20/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (CORCORAN, J.) Modified on 3/26/2019 (fb).
February 26, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DAVID BROWN, KIRSTIN BROWN. (ahf)
February 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to A.H., BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF ROSE TREE MEDIA SCHOOL DISTRICT, C.M., ALISA HERMAN-LIU, J.H., PENNCREST HIGH SCHOOL, ROSE TREE MEDIA SCHOOL DISTRICT, STEVEN SILVA. 8 Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/27/2019 (ahf)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A.H., BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF ROSE TREE MEDIA SCHOOL DISTRICT, C.M., JANE DOE (1), JOHN DOE (1), ALISA HERMAN-LIU, J.H., JOHN DOE (2), PENNCREST HIGH SCHOOL, ROSE TREE MEDIA SCHOOL DISTRICT, STEVEN SILVA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 193072.), filed by KIRSTIN BROWN, DAVID BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN et al v. BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF ROSE TREE MEDIA SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRSTIN BROWN
Represented By: J. CONOR CORCORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BROWN
Represented By: J. CONOR CORCORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSE TREE MEDIA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALISA HERMAN-LIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNCREST HIGH SCHOOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN SILVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF ROSE TREE MEDIA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?