REYNOLDS v. TURNING POINT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA MARY REYNOLDS
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF BRICK, LLC, TURNING POINT OF MARLTON, LLC, TURNING POINT OF BRYN MAWR, LLC, TURNING POINT OF SEA GRIT, LLC, TURNING POINT OF LITTLE SILVER, LLC, TURNING POINT OF MOORESTOWN, LLC, TURNING POINT OF BLUE BELL, LLC, TURNING POINT OF PRINCETON, LLC, TURNING POINT OF NEW JERSEY, LLC, TURNING POINT OF WESTFIELD, LLC, DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, TURNING POINT OF CHERRY HILL, LLC, TURNING POINT OF NEWTOWN, LLC, TURNING POINT OF MANALAPAN, LLC, TURNING POINT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, TURNING POINT OF LONG BRANCH, LLC, TURNING POINT OF NORTH WALES, LLC, TURNING POINT OF HOBOKEN, LLC, TURNING POINT OF WARRINGTON, LLC, KIRK RUOFF, TURNING POINT OF HOLMDEL, LLC and TURNING POINT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01935
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Referring Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER TO HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 06/28/2019. 06/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed by Talone & Associates re: served Summons and Complaint upon TURNING POINT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC; TURNING POINT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC; TURNING POINT OF BLUE BELL, LLC; TURNING POINT OF NORTH WALES, LLC; TURNING POINT OF WARRINGTON, LLC; TURNING POINT OF BRYN MAWR, LLC; TURNING POINT OF NEWTOWN, LLC; TURNING POINT OF NEW JERSEY, LLC; TURNING POINT OF BRICK, LLC; TURNING POINT OF HOBOKEN, LLC; TURNING POINT OF HOLMDEL, LLC; TURNING POINT OF LITTLE SILVER, LLC; TURNING POINT OF LONG BRANCH, LLC; TURNING POINT OF MANALAPAN, LLC; TURNING POINT OF WESTFIELD, LLC; TURNING POINT OF CHERRY HILL, LLC; TURNING POINT OF MARLTON, LLC; TURNING POINT OF MOORESTOWN, LLC; TURNING POINT OF PRINCETON, LLC; TURNING POINT OF SEA GIRT, LLC; KIRK RUOFF by Personal Service on 06/13/2019, answers due 7/5/2019. (WELLS, GERALD) Modified on 6/17/2019 (tjd).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC (ECF NO. #3 ) IS GRANTED. MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 05/28/2019.05/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Matthew D. Brady ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13538508.) filed by CHRISTINA MARY REYNOLDS.Certificate of Service.(LYNCH, GARY)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY F. LYNCH on behalf of CHRISTINA MARY REYNOLDS (LYNCH, GARY)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, KIRK RUOFF, TURNING POINT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, TURNING POINT OF BLUE BELL, LLC, TURNING POINT OF BRICK, LLC, TURNING POINT OF BRYN MAWR, LLC, TURNING POINT OF CHERRY HILL, LLC, TURNING POINT OF HOBOKEN, LLC, TURNING POINT OF HOLMDEL, LLC, TURNING POINT OF LITTLE SILVER, LLC, TURNING POINT OF LONG BRANCH, LLC, TURNING POINT OF MANALAPAN, LLC, TURNING POINT OF MARLTON, LLC, TURNING POINT OF MOORESTOWN, LLC, TURNING POINT OF NEW JERSEY, LLC, TURNING POINT OF NEWTOWN, LLC, TURNING POINT OF NORTH WALES, LLC, TURNING POINT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, TURNING POINT OF PRINCETON, LLC, TURNING POINT OF SEA GRIT, LLC, TURNING POINT OF WARRINGTON, LLC, TURNING POINT OF WESTFIELD, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 196763.) filed by CHRISTINA MARY REYNOLDS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(jaa, )
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order 21 Summons Issued as to KIRK RUOFF, TURNING POINT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, TURNING POINT OF BLUE BELL, LLC, TURNING POINT OF BRICK, LLC, TURNING POINT OF BRYN MAWR, LLC, TURNING POINT OF CHERRY HILL, LLC, TURNING POINT OF HOBOKEN, LLC, TURNING POINT OF HOLMDEL, LLC, TURNING POINT OF LITTLE SILVER, LLC, TURNING POINT OF LONG BRANCH, LLC, TURNING POINT OF MANALAPAN, LLC, TURNING POINT OF MARLTON, LLC, TURNING POINT OF MOORESTOWN, LLC, TURNING POINT OF NEW JERSEY, LLC, TURNING POINT OF NEWTOWN, LLC, TURNING POINT OF NORTH WALES, LLC, TURNING POINT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, TURNING POINT OF PRINCETON, LLC, TURNING POINT OF SEA GRIT, LLC, TURNING POINT OF WARRINGTON, LLC, TURNING POINT OF WESTFIELD, LLC. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 5/8/19 (jaa, )
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHRISTINA MARY REYNOLDS. (jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REYNOLDS v. TURNING POINT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF BRICK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF MARLTON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF BRYN MAWR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF SEA GRIT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF LITTLE SILVER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF MOORESTOWN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF BLUE BELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF PRINCETON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF NEW JERSEY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF WESTFIELD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF CHERRY HILL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF NEWTOWN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF MANALAPAN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF LONG BRANCH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF NORTH WALES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF HOBOKEN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF WARRINGTON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRK RUOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT OF HOLMDEL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNING POINT HOLDING COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA MARY REYNOLDS
Represented By: GERALD D. WELLS, III
Represented By: GARY F. LYNCH
Represented By: MATTHEW D. BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?