MILLER v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Plaintiff: LYNDA MICHELLE MILLER
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv01936
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: LYNNE A SITARSKI
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Social Security Magistrate Consent by LYNDA MICHELLE MILLER.. (ROSEN, HOWARD)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE CONSENT TO OR DECLINATION OF JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. FAILURE TO COMPLETE AND FILE THE FORM AS ORDERED HEREIN SHALL BE DEEMED CONSENT TO THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND THE ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL EXERCISE JURISDICTION FOR ALL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 5/29/19. 5/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (mbh, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/19/2018.5/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO HUTCHINSON, EMAILED. (rf, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(rf, )
May 3, 2019 2 Original Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney General forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 5/3/19. 1 Summons forwarded to U.S. Attorney on 5/3/19.(rf, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF A SOCIAL SECURITY DISABILITY OR SUPPLEMENTAL SECURITY INCOME DECISION against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE196764.), filed by LYNDA MICHELLE MILLER, EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNDA MICHELLE MILLER
Represented By: HOWARD A. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?